Schmidt v. Vision Service Plan et al
Plaintiff: Michael Schmidt
Defendant: Vision Service Plan, VSP Optical Group, Inc., VSP Global, Inc., Marchon Eyewear, Inc. and Eyefinity, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02400
Filed: December 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Mendez
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1938
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Marchon Eyewear, Inc. on 12/17/2020, Answer due 2/16/2021 (Gordon, Scott)
January 11, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Eyefinity, Inc. on 12/17/2020, Answer due 2/16/2021 (Gordon, Scott)
January 11, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to VSP Optical Group, Inc. on 12/17/2020, Answer due 2/16/2021 (Gordon, Scott)
January 11, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to VSP Global, Inc. on 12/16/2020, Answer due 2/16/2021 (Gordon, Scott)
January 11, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Vision Service Plan on 12/16/2020, Answer due 2/16/2021 (Gordon, Scott)
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
December 3, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Eyefinity, Inc., Marchon Eyewear, Inc., VSP Global, Inc., VSP Optical Group, Inc., Vision Service Plan* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Carolyn H. Cottrell* *Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky LLP* *2000 Powell St., Suite 1400* *Emeryville, CA 94608*. (Benson, A.)
December 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Michael Schmidt. Attorney Cottrell, Carolyn H. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9278717) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet(Cottrell, Carolyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmidt v. Vision Service Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vision Service Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VSP Optical Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VSP Global, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marchon Eyewear, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eyefinity, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Schmidt
Represented By: Carolyn H. Cottrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?