Brooks v. USAPE, LLC
Plaintiff: Valerie Brooks
Defendant: USAPE LLC Doing business as BAPE and USAPE, LLC Doing business as BAPE
Case Number: 2:2020cv02456
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Morrison C England
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by not More than 28 Days by USAPE, LLC. Attorney Akley, Benjamin S. added. (Akley, Benjamin)
January 11, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by not More than 28 Days by USAPE LLC. Attorney Niborski, Michael added. (Niborski, Michael)
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *USAPE LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Thiago Merlini Coelho* *Wilshire Law Firm* *3055 Wilshire Blvd., 12th Floor* *Los Angeles, CA 90010*. (Benson, A.)
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against USAPE LLC d/b/a BAPE by Valerie Brooks. Attorney Coelho, Thiago Merlini added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9297531) (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Coelho, Thiago)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. USAPE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Brooks
Represented By: Thiago Merlini Coelho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAPE LLC Doing business as BAPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAPE, LLC Doing business as BAPE
Represented By: Benjamin S. Akley
Represented By: Michael Niborski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?