Collins et al v. USA
Plaintiff: C. N., Jennifer Fay Collins, S. C. and T. N.
Defendant: Nicholas Henke and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv02458
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Filing 8 CASE DISMISSED as to Defendant Nicholas Henke, without prejudice, pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). See #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Michel, G.)
January 4, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of Defendant, Nicholas Henke by all plaintiffs. (Deedon, Patrick)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/23/2020 GRANTING #5 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. APPOINTING Jennifer Fay Collins as Guardian ad Litem for minors C.N., T.N., and S.C., for purposes of this action. (Reader, L)
December 22, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM by S. C., Jennifer Fay Collins, C. N., T. N.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Deedon, Patrick) Modified on 2/23/2020 (Becknal, R).
December 17, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Nicholas Henke served on 12/14/2020. (Deedon, Patrick) Modified on 12/18/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Nicholas Henke, United States of America* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Patrick L. Deedon* *Maire & Deedon* *2851 Park Marina Dr., Suite 300* *Redding, CA 96001-2813*. (Benson, A.)
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9298550) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Deedon, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins et al v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. N.
Represented By: Patrick L. Deedon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Fay Collins
Represented By: Patrick L. Deedon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. C.
Represented By: Patrick L. Deedon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. N.
Represented By: Patrick L. Deedon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Henke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?