(PC) Garcia v. State of California et al
Plaintiff: Patrick James Garcia
Defendant: State of California, Lassen County Sheriff's Dept. and Lassen County Jail
Case Number: 2:2021cv00135
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order served on Patrick James Garcia. (Henshaw, R)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/3/2021 ORDERING Plaintiff to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a certified copy of his inmate trust account statement for the 6 month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. (Henshaw, R)
January 26, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Patrick James Garcia. (Zignago, K.)
January 26, 2021 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 3/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Zignago, K.)
January 25, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Patrick James Garcia. (Zignago, K.)
January 25, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against all Defendants by Patrick James Garcia. (Zignago, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Garcia v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lassen County Sheriff's Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lassen County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick James Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?