(PC) Brown v. Kishbaugh et al
Plaintiff: Mark Anthony Brown
Defendant: C. Kishbaugh, J. Hutchison and A. Munoz
Case Number: 2:2021cv00149
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Filing 9 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: IFP application #2 served on Director of CDC. (Plummer, M)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Mark Anthony Brown signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 03/05/21. CDC shall collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 03/05/21 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff shall pay the statutory filing fee of $350. All payments shall be collected in accordance with the notice to the California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation filed concurrently herewith. Plaintiffs complaint #1 is DISMISSED with leave to amend within 30 days from the date of service of this order. (Plummer, M)
March 5, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, served on Mark Anthony Brown. (Plummer, M)
March 5, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, served on Mark Anthony Brown. (Plummer, M)
February 1, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Coll, A)
January 27, 2021 Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Mark Anthony Brown. (Huang, H)
January 26, 2021 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Mark Anthony Brown, CDC AP-0910 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Henshaw, R)
January 26, 2021 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *1/26/2021*; Consent or Decline due by 3/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Huang, H)
January 26, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Mark Anthony Brown. (Huang, H)
January 26, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against J. Hutchison, C. Kishbaugh, A. Munoz by Mark Anthony Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Huang, H)
January 26, 2021 SERVICE BY E-MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Mark Anthony Brown. (Huang, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Brown v. Kishbaugh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Kishbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Hutchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Anthony Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?