(PC) Perryman v. Warden
Plaintiff: David Perryman
Defendant: Warden
Case Number: 2:2021cv00421
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Filing 8 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: IFP application #2 served on Director of CDC. (Plummer, M)
April 1, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, served on David Perryman. (Plummer, M)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of David Perryman signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 03/31/21. CDC shall collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
March 31, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order and complaint form served on David Perryman. (Henshaw, R)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 3/30/2021 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP and GRANTING Plaintiff 60 days from the service of this order to file either an amended complaint or advise the court he wishes to stand by his current complaint. (Henshaw, R)
March 12, 2021 Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by David Perryman (Rodriguez, E)
March 11, 2021 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for David Perryman, CDC AB-1204 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Henshaw, R)
March 10, 2021 SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on David Perryman. (Rodriguez, E)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *3/9/2021*; Consent or Decline due by 4/12/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Rodriguez, E)
March 9, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by David Perryman. (Rodriguez, E)
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Warden by David Perryman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rodriguez, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Perryman v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Perryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?