Sacramento Downtown Arena LLC et al v. Factory Mutual Ins. Co.
Plaintiff: Sacramento Downtown Arena LLC, SGD Retail LLC, Sacramento Kings Limited Partnership and Sac MUB1 Hotel, LLC
Defendant: Factory Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv00441
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/28/2022 ORDERING that #42 The Motion for leave to file supplemental authority is GRANTED, and the court has considered the supplemental authority provided by the parties. The Motion to Dismiss #10 is DENIED. A status (pretrial scheduling) conference is set for 12/1/2022 at 2:30 p.m., with a joint status report due fourteen days prior. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 18, 2022 Filing 44 RESPONSE by SGD Retail LLC, Sac MUB1 Hotel, LLC, Sacramento Downtown Arena LLC, Sacramento Kings Limited Partnership to #42 Motion for leave to file supplemental authority. (Crombie, Fredrick) Modified on 3/21/2022 (Reader, L).
March 16, 2022 Filing 43 REPLY by Factory Mutual Insurance Company re #40 Response. (Wang, Joyce)
March 10, 2022 Filing 42 MOTION for leave to file supplemental authority by Factory Mutual Insurance Company re #10 Motion to Dismiss. (Wang, Joyce) Modified on 3/11/2022 (Zignago, K.).
March 9, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority (Live Nation) by SGD Retail LLC, Sac MUB1 Hotel, LLC, Sacramento Downtown Arena LLC, Sacramento Kings Limited Partnership re #38 Order. (Crombie, Fredrick) Modified on 3/11/2022 (Zignago, K.).
March 9, 2022 Filing 40 RESPONSE by SGD Retail LLC, Sac MUB1 Hotel, LLC, Sacramento Downtown Arena LLC, Sacramento Kings Limited Partnership to #34 Order. (Crombie, Fredrick)
March 4, 2022 Filing 39 RESPONSE by Factory Mutual Insurance Company to #38 Order. (Wang, Joyce) Modified on 3/7/2022 (Zignago, K.).
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/2/2022 GRANTING #37 Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority and Request for Judicial Notice. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 22, 2022 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority and Request for Judicial Notice by SGD Plaintiffs. (Crombie, Fredrick) Modified on 2/24/2022 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/10/2021. (Coll, A)
December 3, 2021 Filing 35 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Protective Order for Standard Litigation by SGD Retail LLC, Sac MUB1 Hotel, LLC, Sacramento Downtown Arena LLC, Sacramento Kings Limited Partnership. (Slavitt, Howard)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/2/2021 GRANTING #31 Motion to File Supplemental Authority and GRANTING plaintiffs' request to file their proposed response. (Huang, H)
November 30, 2021 Filing 33 RESPONSE by SGD Retail LLC et al to #31 Motion . (Crombie, Fredrick)
November 24, 2021 Filing 32 REPLY by Factory Mutual Insurance Company re #30 Response, #27 Opposition. (Wang, Joyce) Modified on 11/24/2021 (Kaminski, H).
November 22, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION to FILE SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Factory Mutual Insurance Company re #10 Motion to Dismiss. (Wang, Joyce) Modified on 11/23/2021 (Benson, A.).
November 22, 2021 Filing 30 RESPONSE by SGD Retail LLC, et al., to Notice of Supplemental Authority. (Crombie, Fredrick) Modified on 11/22/2021 (Benson, A.).
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/8/2021 GRANTING #26 Motion to file Supplemental Authority and GRANTING #27 Request to file Proposed Response, which must be filed by 11/19/2021. (Huang, H)
October 20, 2021 Filing 28 REPLY by Factory Mutual Insurance Company in RESPONSE to #26 Motion. #27 Opposition to Motion. (Wang, Joyce) Modified on 10/21/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
October 13, 2021 Filing 27 OPPOSITION by SGD Retail LLC, et al., to #26 Motion to File Supplemental Authority. (Crombie, Fredrick) Modified on 10/14/2021 (Benson, A.).
October 6, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for LEAVE to FILE SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Factory Mutual Insurance Company re #10 Motion to Dismiss. (Wang, Joyce) Modified on 10/7/2021 (Kaminski, H).
August 4, 2021 Filing 25 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for proceedings held on 7/16/2021 before Judge Judge Mueller. Court Reporter Jennifer Coulthard. (Coulthard, J)
July 27, 2021 Filing 24 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Motion to dismiss held on 7/16/2021, before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, filed by Jennifer Coulthard, Phone number 530-537-9312 E-mail jenrmrcrr2@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 8/19/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/27/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/25/2021. (Coulthard, Jennifer)
July 23, 2021 Filing 23 OBJECTION AND REQUEST by SGD Retail LLC, Sac MUB1 Hotel, LLC, Sacramento Downtown Arena LLC, Sacramento Kings Limited Partnership to #22 Supplemental Brief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transcript for Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs' Response to Supplemental Brief)(Crombie, Fredrick) Modified on 7/27/2021 (Reader, L).
July 21, 2021 Filing 22 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re Judicially Noticed Matter in support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Factory Mutual Insurance Company. (Wang, Joyce) Modified on 7/22/2021 (Huang, H).
July 21, 2021 Filing 21 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Factory Mutual Insurance Company for proceedings held on 07/16/2021 before Judge Hon. Kimberly J. Mueller. Court Reporter Jennifer Coulthard. (Wang, Joyce)
July 21, 2021 Filing 20 STIPULATION re Judicial Notice of the Affiliated Factory Mutual Insurance Policies from Nguyen v. Travelers Cas. Ins. Co. of Am. by All Plaintiffs. (Crombie, Fredrick) Modified on 7/22/2021 (Huang, H).
July 21, 2021 Filing 19 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by SGD Retail LLC, Sac MUB1 Hotel, LLC, Sacramento Downtown Arena LLC, Sacramento Kings Limited Partnership for proceedings held on 07/16/2021 before Judge Mueller. Court Reporter Jennifer Coulthard. (Crombie, Fredrick)
July 16, 2021 Filing 18 MINUTES for MOTION HEARING held via video conference before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/16/2021. Plaintiffs' Counsel, Fredrick Crombie, Howard Slavitt, and Richard Patch, present. Defendant's Counsel, Joyce Wang and Lisa Kirk, present. Jeff Dorso, Plaintiffs' client representative, present. Robert Brunelli, Defendant's client representative, present. The court decided not to go over scheduling. The court heard oral argument as to Defendant's #10 Motion to Dismiss. Matter SUBMITTED. A written order will issue. Court Reporter: Jennifer Coulthard. (Text Only Entry) (York, M)
July 9, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY by Factory Mutual Insurance Company to RESPONSE to #10 Motion to Dismiss,. (Wang, Joyce)
July 6, 2021 Filing 16 JOINT STATUS REPORT by SGD Retail LLC, Sac MUB1 Hotel, LLC, Sacramento Downtown Arena LLC, Sacramento Kings Limited Partnership. (Slavitt, Howard)
July 2, 2021 Filing 15 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by SGD Retail LLC, Sac MUB1 Hotel, LLC, Sacramento Downtown Arena LLC, Sacramento Kings Limited Partnership in re #14 Opposition to Motion. (Crombie, Fredrick)
July 2, 2021 Filing 14 OPPOSITION by SGD Retail LLC, Sac MUB1 Hotel, LLC, Sacramento Downtown Arena LLC, Sacramento Kings Limited Partnership to #10 Motion to Dismiss,. (Crombie, Fredrick)
May 18, 2021 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/18/2021: On the court's own motion, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 7/22/2021 is ADVANCED to 7/16/2021 at 10:00 AM before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of a joint status report due fourteen (14) days prior. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C)
May 13, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on #10 Motion to Dismiss, : Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Kirk, Lisa)
May 7, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Factory Mutual Insurance Company. (Wang, Joyce)
May 7, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to DISMISS by Factory Mutual Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice)(Wang, Joyce)
March 29, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION to EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint by Factory Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney Wang, Joyce Chungwhei added. (Wang, Joyce)
March 22, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Factory Mutual Insurance Company served on 3/19/2021, answer due 4/9/2021. (Pulliam, Benjamin)
March 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Fredrick C. Crombie on behalf of SGD Retail LLC, Sac MUB1 Hotel, LLC, Sacramento Downtown Arena LLC, Sacramento Kings Limited Partnership. Attorney Crombie, Fredrick C. added. (Crombie, Fredrick)
March 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Benjamin Charles Pulliam on behalf of SGD Retail LLC, Sac MUB1 Hotel, LLC, Sacramento Downtown Arena LLC, Sacramento Kings Limited Partnership. Attorney Pulliam, Benjamin Charles added. (Pulliam, Benjamin)
March 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Richard R. Patch on behalf of SGD Retail LLC, Sac MUB1 Hotel, LLC, Sacramento Downtown Arena LLC, Sacramento Kings Limited Partnership. Attorney Patch, Richard R. added. (Patch, Richard)
March 12, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/22/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
March 12, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Factory Mutual Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Howard A. Slavitt* *Coblentz Patch Duffy & Bass LLP* *One Montgomery St., Suite 3000* *San Francisco, CA 94104*. (Benson, A.)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiffs. (Slavitt, Howard)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Factory Mutual Insurance Company by All Plaintiffs. Attorney Slavitt, Howard A. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9470526) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Slavitt, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sacramento Downtown Arena LLC et al v. Factory Mutual Ins. Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sacramento Downtown Arena LLC
Represented By: Howard A. Slavitt
Represented By: Fredrick C. Crombie
Represented By: Richard R. Patch
Represented By: Benjamin Charles Pulliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SGD Retail LLC
Represented By: Howard A. Slavitt
Represented By: Fredrick C. Crombie
Represented By: Richard R. Patch
Represented By: Benjamin Charles Pulliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sacramento Kings Limited Partnership
Represented By: Howard A. Slavitt
Represented By: Fredrick C. Crombie
Represented By: Richard R. Patch
Represented By: Benjamin Charles Pulliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sac MUB1 Hotel, LLC
Represented By: Howard A. Slavitt
Represented By: Fredrick C. Crombie
Represented By: Richard R. Patch
Represented By: Benjamin Charles Pulliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Factory Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Joyce Chungwhei Wang
Represented By: Lisa L. Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?