(PC) Jacques v. Frederick et al
Plaintiff: Michael E. Jacques
Defendant: J. Lynch, J. Frederick, G. Collinsworth and H. Moseley
Case Number: 2:2021cv00541
Filed: March 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to High Desert State Prison, PO Box 3030, Susanville CA 96127 and MOTION for 60-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME by Michael E. Jacques. (Zignago, K.)
April 27, 2021 Filing 12 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #2 Motion to Proceed IFP served on CDCR. (Henshaw, R)
April 27, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order served on Michael E. Jacques. (Henshaw, R)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 4/26/2021 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Michael E. Jacques. The custodial agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
April 26, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order and complaint form served on Michael E. Jacques. (Henshaw, R)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 4/26/2021 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP; GRANTING #6 Motion to Amend the Complaint; DENYING as MOOT #8 Motion to Proceed IFP; GRANTING Plaintiff 60 days within which to file either an amended complaint or advise the court he wishes stand by his current complaint. Clerk's office is directed to sent Plaintiff a complaint form. (Henshaw, R)
April 5, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rodriguez, E)
April 5, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Michael E. Jacques. (Zignago, K.)
April 5, 2021 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against all Defendants by Michael E. Jacques. (Zignago, K.)
April 5, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to AMEND the #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint by Michael E. Jacques. (Zignago, K.)
March 26, 2021 Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Michael E. Jacques (Rodriguez, E)
March 26, 2021 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Michael E. Jacques, CDC AX-5885 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (TEXT ONLY) (Plummer, M)
March 25, 2021 SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Michael E. Jacques. (Rodriguez, E)
March 25, 2021 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *3/24/2021*; Consent or Decline due by 4/29/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Rodriguez, E)
March 24, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Michael E. Jacques. (Rodriguez, E)
March 24, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against G. Collinsworth, J. Frederick, J. Lynch, H. Moseley by Michael E. Jacques. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rodriguez, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Jacques v. Frederick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Collinsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Moseley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E. Jacques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?