Romero v. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alma Romero
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc. and Coopersurgical, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00629
Filed: April 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2021 OTHER COURT CASE NUMBER from Northern District of Georgia case number 1:21-cv-01745. (Gonzalez, R)
April 27, 2021 Filing 13 MDL ORDER. CASE TRANSFERRED to District of Northern District of Georgia. CASE CLOSED. ELECTRONIC TRANSFER SENT. (Donati, J)
April 12, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc. re #11 Civil New Case Documents for JAM. (Rhoads, Kathleen)
April 8, 2021 Filing 11 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
April 7, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Coopersurgical, Inc..(Rhoads, Kathleen)
April 7, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER with Jury Demand by The Cooper Companies, Inc.. Attorney Rhoads, Kathleen M. added.(Rhoads, Kathleen)
April 7, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc..(Rhoads, Kathleen)
April 7, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc..(Rhoads, Kathleen)
April 7, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Teva Women's Health, Inc..(Rhoads, Kathleen)
April 7, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Teva Women's Health, LLC.(Rhoads, Kathleen)
April 7, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Coopersurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Rhoads, Kathleen)
April 7, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.. (Rhoads, Kathleen)
April 7, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc. (Rhoads, Kathleen)
April 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sutter County Superior Court, case number SVCS21-0000337 by all Defendants. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9528986) (Rhoads, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romero v. Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen M. Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, LLC
Represented By: Kathleen M. Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen M. Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen M. Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen M. Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coopersurgical, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen M. Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma Romero
Represented By: Lauren Aliz Welling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?