(SS) Maxwell v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jealena Maxwell
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2021cv00680
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jealena Maxwell. Commissioner of Social Security served on 4/23/2021, answer due 6/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certified mail receipts)(Forslund, Jacqueline)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL Consent or Decline due by 7/19/2021 (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) [NO SCHEDULING ORDER will issue pursuant to General Order 615] (Benson, A.)
April 16, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jacqueline Anna Forslund* *Forslund Law LLC* *P.O. Box 4476* *Sunriver, OR 97707*. (Benson, A.)
April 15, 2021 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0972-9545595. (Bosavanh, Sengthiene)
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Jealena Maxwell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Forslund, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Maxwell v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jealena Maxwell
Represented By: Jacqueline Anna Forslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?