Burton et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Melvin Burton and Catherine Burton
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00708
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE: #6 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/15/2021: IT IS ORDERED that defendant's motion to dismiss #6 be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Plaintiffs have twenty days from the date this Order is signed to file an amended complaint, if they can do so consistent with this Order. (Kirksey Smith, K)
June 14, 2021 Filing 13 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings via video conference before Senior District Judge William B. Shubb: MOTION HEARING held on 6/14/2021 re: Defendant's #6 Motion to Dismiss. Counsel argue. MOTION SUBMITTED. The Court shall prepare and issue a separate order. Plaintiffs' Counsel Peter Nisson present. Defendant's Counsel John Freed present. Court Reporter: Tiphanne Crowe. (York, M)
June 3, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Dismiss. (Freed, John)
May 26, 2021 Filing 11 OPPOSITION by Catherine Burton, Melvin Burton to #6 Motion to Dismiss. (Cara, Anthony)
April 29, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Cara, Anthony)
April 29, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ALLEGATIONS OF VIOLATION OF TITLE U.S.C. 1641(g) ONLY by Catherine Burton, Melvin Burton. (Cara, Anthony) Modified on 4/30/2021 (Kaminski, H).
April 29, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Freed, John)
April 22, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. in re #6 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Freed, John)
April 22, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to DISMISS by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Freed, John)
April 20, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #3 Notice of Appearance, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal,. (Freed, John)
April 20, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/16/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
April 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Joseph E. Addiego, III on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Attorney Addiego, Joseph E. added. (Addiego, Joseph)
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Freed, John)
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2021-00295035 by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9551528) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Notice of Interested Parties or Persons)(Freed, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burton et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Joseph E. Addiego, III
Represented By: John D. Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Burton
Represented By: Anthony Paul Cara
Represented By: Peter Nisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Burton
Represented By: Anthony Paul Cara
Represented By: Peter Nisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?