R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company v. Pappas
Plaintiff: R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company
Defendant: John Pappas, III, Meriliz Inc. Doing business as Dome Printing and PM Packaging
Counter Claimant: Meriliz Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00753
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
2 Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Defend Trade Secrets Act (of 2016)
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1836 (a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2023 Filing 103 NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek Hecht, #2 Proposed Order)(Blocher, Linde) Modified on 3/8/2023 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
March 7, 2023 Filing 102 STIPULATION to Amend Complaint by R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company. (Blocher, Linde) Modified on 3/8/2023 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
February 21, 2023 Filing 101 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by John Edward Brooks on behalf of John Pappas, III. Attorney John Edward Brooks added. (Brooks, John) Modified on 3/8/2023 (Rodriguez, E).
February 21, 2023 Filing 100 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Matthew R. Richard on behalf of John Pappas, III. Attorney Matthew R. Richard added. (Brooks, John) Modified on 3/8/2023 (Rodriguez, E).
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 01/18/2023 GRANTING the #87 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and DIRECTING John Pappas III and Merilitz, Inc. to secure new counsel within 30 days. (Spichka, K.)
January 19, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #99 Order served on Meriliz Inc., John Pappas III. (Spichka, K.)
January 18, 2023 Filing 98 MINUTES for MOTION HEARING proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire: held on 1/18/2023. All parties present. Court and counsel discussed the pending #87 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Matter submitted. Court order to follow. Plaintiffs Counsel Derek Hecht present. Defendants Counsel Dylan Wiseman present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO. (Anderson, J)
December 28, 2022 Filing 97 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company for proceedings held on 12/8/2022 before Judge Dale A. Drozd. Court Reporter Jennifer Coulthard. (Hecht, Derek)
December 27, 2022 Filing 96 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by Meriliz Inc., John Pappas, III to #87 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Proof of Service for Notice Non-Receipt)(Wiseman, Dylan)
December 27, 2022 Filing 95 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Motion hearing held on 12/8/22, before District Judge Dale A. Drozd, filed by Jennifer Coulthard, Phone number 530-537-9312 E-mail jenrmrcrr2@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 1/20/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/27/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/27/2023. (Coulthard, Jennifer)
December 22, 2022 Filing 94 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) issued by Courtroom Deputy for District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/22/2022: Pursuant to the parties' #93 Stipulation and request to extend the fact discovery deadline as to defendant PM Packaging, the court hereby resets the fact discovery deadline to 3/20/2023.(Buzo, P)
December 21, 2022 Filing 93 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Discovery Cut-Off by R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company. (Hecht, Derek) Modified on 12/27/2022 (Coll, A).
December 13, 2022 Filing 92 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by PM Packaging for proceedings held on 12/08/2022 before Judge Dale A. Drozd. Court Reporter Jennifer Coulthard. (Brooks, John)
December 8, 2022 Filing 91 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference before District Judge Dale A. Drozd: MOTION HEARING held on 12/8/2022 re #38 MOTION to DISMISS amending #37 Counterclaim MOTION to STRIKE re #37 Counterclaim. filed by R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company. Linde Blocher and Derek Hecht appeared by video on behalf of R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company. Dylan Wiseman appeared on behalf of John Pappas. Ms. Blocher addressed the court as stated on the record. Mr. Wiseman addressed the court as stated on the record. Ms. Blocher addressed Mr. Wiseman's argument. After hearing of arguments, for the reasons stated on the record during the court's 12/8/2022 hearing, plaintiff and counter-defendant R. R. Donnelley & Sons's #38 motion to strike/ and dismiss counterclaimants' #37 first amended counterclaim is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Counsel Linde Blocher, Derek Hecht present by video. Defendants Counsel Dylan Wiseman present by video. Court Reporter/CD Number: Jennifer Coulthard. (Buzo, P)
December 7, 2022 Filing 90 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Anderson for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/07/2022 re #89 Order Referring Motion. On the Courts own motion the #87 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney currently set for 01/17/2023 is VACATED and RESET for 1/18/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Text Only Entry)(Anderson, J)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/5/2022 REFERRING #87 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney to Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Coll, A)
December 5, 2022 Filing 88 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Linde Blocher on behalf of R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company. Attorney Blocher, Linde added. (Blocher, Linde)
December 2, 2022 Filing 87 MOTION to WITHDRAW as ATTORNEY by Buchalter for Meriliz Inc., John Pappas, III. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dylan Wiseman, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Wiseman, Dylan) Modified on 12/5/2022 (Benson, A.).
December 2, 2022 Filing 86 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) issued by Courtroom Deputy for District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/2/2022: The Eastern District of California's overwhelming caseload has been well publicized, and the long-standing lack of adequate judicial resources in this district long ago reached crisis proportions. While that situation was partially addressed by the U.S. Senate's confirmation of district judges for two of this court's vacancies on December 17, 2021, and June 21, 2022, another vacancy on this court with only six authorized district judge positions was created on April 17, 2022, and remains unfilled. This crisis continues to have serious implications for this court and litigants appearing before it. Judge Drozd recently transferred to the Sacramento courthouse and was reassigned cases previously presided over by other district judges there. Unfortunately, the cases reassigned to Judge Drozd came with a substantial backlog of over 100 fully briefed motions, the majority of which have already been submitted for decision. In order to devote the court's limited resources to working through this extensive backlog of previously submitted motions as quickly as possible, drastic measures have been implemented. Although it is not Judge Drozd's preference to significantly limit oral argument on civil motions, in light of the judicial crisis facing this district, the court will not entertain more than five (5) minutes of oral argument, per side, at the hearing on December 8, 2022. As the court previously advised the parties, the court intends to rule from the bench and Local Rule 237 shall not apply.(Buzo, P)
November 28, 2022 Filing 85 ANSWER with Jury Demand by PM Packaging. Attorney Brooks, John Edward added.(Brooks, John)
November 16, 2022 Filing 84 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: PM Packaging served on 11/3/2022. (Romeo, Mark) Modified on 11/17/2022 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) issued by Courtroom Deputy for District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/14/2022: The court hereby specially sets the pending #38 Motion for a hearing on 12/8/2022 at 02:45 PM before District Judge Dale A. Drozd by Zoom video. Counsel shall inform the court as to which attorneys will be appearing at the hearing by emailing Judge Drozd's Courtroom Deputy Pete Buzo at PBuzo@caed.uscourts.gov by no later than 12/1/2022. Counsel will thereafter receive a Zoom ID number and password for the hearing by email. Any other interested parties or members of the public may access the hearing telephonically by dialing 8885578511 and using access code 9683466, at the time of the hearing. The parties are advised that the court anticipates making an oral ruling on the motion and Local Rule 137 shall not apply.(Buzo, P)
November 14, 2022 Filing 82 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Meriliz Inc., John Pappas, III.(Wiseman, Dylan)
November 2, 2022 Filing 81 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *PM Packaging* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mark A. Romeo* *Littler Mendelson, P.C.* *18565 Jamboree Rd. Suite 800* *Irvine, CA 92612*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 1, 2022 Filing 80 SEALED EVENT. (Rodriguez, E)
October 28, 2022 Filing 79 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Meriliz Inc., John Pappas, III, PM Packaging by R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company.(Romeo, Mark)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/21/2022 GRANTING the #71 Motion to Amend the Complaint and the #72 Request to Seal. The Redacted Second Amended Complaint and Unredacted Second Amended Complaint are due within 7 days. The scheduling order in this case is now MODIFIED as follows: Discovery due by 01/23/2023 and Dispositive motions due by 03/06/2023. (Spichka, K.)
October 10, 2022 Filing 77 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) issued by Courtroom Deputy for District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/10/2022: re #72 Notice of Request to Seal Document(s), #71 Motion to Amend the Complaint/Petition. The Eastern District of California's overwhelming caseload has been well publicized, and the long-standing lack of adequate judicial resources in this district long ago reached crisis proportions. While that situation was partially addressed by the U.S. Senate's confirmation of district judges for two of this court's vacancies on December 17, 2021, and June 21, 2022, another vacancy on this court with only six authorized district judge positions was created on April 17, 2022, and remains unfilled. This crisis continues to have serious implications for this court and litigants appearing before it. Judge Drozd recently transferred to the Sacramento courthouse and was reassigned cases previously presided over by other district judges there. Unfortunately, the cases reassigned to Judge Drozd came with a substantial backlog of over 100 fully briefed motions, the majority of which have already been submitted for decision. In order to devote the court's limited resources to working through this extensive backlog of previously submitted motions as quickly as possible, Judge Drozd has reluctantly determined that hearings on civil motions will not be held before him until substantial progress has been made on clearing the backlog of motions. Accordingly, the court hereby VACATES all hearings on civil motions set before Judge Drozd in this case. The parties should not contact Judge Drozd's chambers to inquire as to whether a hearing on a pending motion will be held. If the court later determines that a hearing on a pending motion will be helpful or is required by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the court will specially set the motion for a hearing. All other court appearances (e.g., status conferences, pretrial conferences, trials) remain on calendar. Although hearings on civil motions will not be held at this time, all applicable filing and notice requirements remain in place. Any motions the parties file must be noticed for a hearing date that complies with the Local Rules and Judge Drozd's Standing Order, as the hearing date remains important for the court's docket management, even if the hearing itself will not be held. In addition, all briefing deadlines remain the same and are not impacted by this order. Finally, Judge Drozd urges the parties to cooperate in meet and confer efforts and do their part to avoid unnecessary motion practice by reaching agreement and filing stipulations whenever possible.(Buzo, P)
August 29, 2022 Filing 76 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/29/2022: In light of the Order of Reassignment, ECF No. #74 , the Motion Hearing as to the pending Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, ECF No. #71 , and Related Sealing Request, ECF No. #72 , set for 10/21/2022 before Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller is VACATED and RESET for 11/1/2022 at 1:30 PM before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. The parties are referred to District Judge Dale A. Drozd's Standing Order, ECF No. #75 , regarding appearance information. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STANDING ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/25/2022. (Donati, J)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The Court having considered the equitable division and efficient and economical determination of court business, hereby reassigns this case from District Judge *Kimberly J. Mueller* to * District Judge Dale A. Drozd* for all further proceedings. (Donati, J)
August 22, 2022 Filing 73 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by Meriliz Inc., John Pappas, III to #71 Motion to Amend the Complaint. (Wiseman, Dylan)
August 8, 2022 Filing 72 NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek S. Hecht, #2 Proposed Order)(Hecht, Derek) Modified on 8/8/2022 (Reader, L).
August 8, 2022 Filing 71 MOTION FOR LEAVE to File Second Amended Complaint #31 by R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Derek S. Hecht, #3 Proposed Order)(Hecht, Derek) Modified on 8/8/2022 (Reader, L).
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 07/26/2022 DENYING #68 Motion to Continue. The #47 contempt motion is thus submitted on the briefs; oral arguments will be reset at a later date only if necessary. See E.D. Cal. L.R. 230(g). (Rodriguez, E)
July 22, 2022 Filing 69 OPPOSITION by R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company to #68 Motion to Continue. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek S. Hecht)(Hecht, Derek) Modified on 7/25/2022 (Kaminski, H).
July 21, 2022 Filing 68 MOTION to CONTINUE Hearing Date by Meriliz Inc., John Pappas, III. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dylan W. Wiseman, #2 Proposed Order)(Wiseman, Dylan) Modified on 7/22/2022 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
July 19, 2022 Filing 67 WITHDRAWAL of #64 Motion to Compel filed by R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company. (Hecht, Derek)
June 17, 2022 Filing 66 JOINT MID-LITIGATION STATEMENTfiled by Plaintiff R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company, Counter Defendant R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company. (Hecht, Derek) Modified on 6/21/2022 (Benson, A.).
June 17, 2022 Filing 65 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Anderson for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 06/17/2022 re #64 Motion to Compel. The hearing on the motion now calendared for Wednesday, August 3, 2022 is ordered submitted without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Rule 230 (g). If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. (Text Only Entry)(Anderson, J)
June 17, 2022 Filing 64 MOTION to COMPEL Discovery Responses from Defendant Dome Printing by R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Hecht, Derek)
June 6, 2022 Filing 63 REPLY by R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company to #47 Motion for Sanctions. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shane D. Shook, #2 Supplemental Declaration of Derek S. Hecht)(Romeo, Mark) Modified on 6/13/2022 (Rodriguez, E).
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/3/2022 GRANTING #58 and #61 Requests to Seal. (Zignago, K.)
May 24, 2022 Filing 61 NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Romeo, Mark)
May 19, 2022 Filing 60 NOTICE of ERRATA re #59 Opposition to Motion by Meriliz Inc., John Pappas, III. (Wiseman, Dylan) Modified on 5/23/2022 (Huang, H).
May 18, 2022 Filing 59 OPPOSITION to #47 Motion for Sanctions by Meriliz Inc., John Pappas, III. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dylan Wiseman (Redacted), #2 Declaration of John Pappas (Redacted))(Wiseman, Dylan) Modified on 5/19/2022 (Huang, H).
May 18, 2022 Filing 58 NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by Meriliz Inc., John Pappas, III. (Wiseman, Dylan)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/9/2022 EXTENDING dates and deadlines as follows: John Pappas III's deadline to file an opposition to the Motion for Contempt due by 5/18/2022. Donnelley's Reply due by 6/6/2022. The #47 Motion for Contempt Hearing CONTINUED to 7/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Coll, A)
May 3, 2022 Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/3/2022: In light of the Reassignment Order, filed at ECF No. 53, the Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/2/2022, the Jury Trial set for 1/30/2023, and the filing deadlines related to those hearings are VACATED, to be reset as appropriate following resolution of the parties' dispositive motions, or expiration of the dispositive motion deadline if no dispositive motions are filed. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C)
May 3, 2022 Filing 55 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Defendant Pappas III to Oppose Motion for Contempt or, In the Alternative, To Issue an Order To Show Cause Why Defendant Should Not be Held in Contempt. (Wiseman, Dylan) Modified on 5/4/2022 (Kastilahn, A).
April 29, 2022 Filing 54 MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy L. Kennison for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/29/2022: In light of the reassignment of this case and on the court's own motion, the Motion for Contempt, ECF No. #47 set for 6/28/2022 is RESET to 7/8/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. The briefing deadlines remain unchanged. (Text Only Entry)(Kennison, L)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/18/2022: Pursuant to the senior status of District Judge John A. Mendez, this case is REASSIGNED to Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller for all further proceedings. District Judge John A. Mendez is no longer assigned to case. The case number on all future filed documents shall be: 2:21-cv-0753 KJM AC. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY)(Donati, J)
April 7, 2022 Filing 52 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT of Exhibit D (flash drive) re #48 Notice of Lodging (Text only entry) (Kaminski, H)
April 7, 2022 Filing 51 SEALED EVENT (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4) (Kastilahn, A)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/7/22; GRANTING #49 RRD's Request to Seal Portions of It's Motion for Contempt (see order for further details). (Kastilahn, A)
April 6, 2022 Filing 49 NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hecht, Derek) Modified on 4/13/2022 (Rodriguez, E).
April 6, 2022 Filing 48 NOTICE OF LODGING: Of USB Flash Drive of Exhibit D re #47 Motion (Hecht, Derek) Modified on 4/12/2022 (Rodriguez, E).
April 6, 2022 Filing 47 MOTION for CONTEMPT, Or, in the alternative, to Issue An Order To Show Cause by R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company. Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration Of Derek S. Hecht, #3 Declaration Of Geo Brown, #4 Declaration Of Craig Roberton, #5 Proposed Order) (Hecht, Derek) Modified on 4/12/2022 (Rodriguez, E).
February 23, 2022 Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/23/2022: The motion now calendared for 3/1/2022 is SUBMITTED without appearance and without oral argument pursuant to Local Rule 230(g). As such, the hearing on said motion is VACATED. If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. IT IS SO ORDERED. [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Michel, G.)
February 22, 2022 Filing 45 REPLY by R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company in support of #38 Motion to Dismiss. (Hecht, Derek) Modified on 2/23/2022 (Coll, A).
February 15, 2022 Filing 44 OPPOSITION by Meriliz Inc., John Pappas, III to #38 Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Strike. (Wiseman, Dylan)
February 14, 2022 Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/14/2022: After reviewing Defendants' Status Report and Request for Referral to Mediation/VDRP, ECF No. #42 , the Court DENIES Defendant's Request. IT IS SO ORDERED. [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Michel, G.)
February 14, 2022 Filing 42 STATUS REPORT; REQUEST FOR REFERRAL TO VDRP by Meriliz Inc., John Pappas, III. (Wiseman, Dylan) Modified on 2/14/2022 (Michel, G.).
February 2, 2022 Filing 41 WITHDRAWAL of #39 Motion to Compel, filed by R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company. (Hecht, Derek)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER: Issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy on behalf of the Honorable Allison Claire, U.S. Magistrate Judge. The hearing on the Motion to Compel Deposition of Non-Party #39 now calendared for Wednesday, February 9, 2022 is ordered submitted without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Code 230(g). If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. As ordered by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/22/2021. (Text Only) (Weisel, D.)
December 21, 2021 Filing 39 MOTION to COMPEL Deposition Of Non-Party Pavlov, Production of Documents and for SANCTIONS by R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company. Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Hecht, Derek) Modified on 12/22/2021 (Benson, A.).
November 24, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION to DISMISS and MOTION to STRIKE re #37 Frist Amended Counterclaim. (Motion Hearing set for 3/1/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez.) by R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(Romeo, Mark)
November 11, 2021 Filing 37 FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company by Meriliz Inc., John Pappas, III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Wiseman, Dylan)
November 3, 2021 Filing 36 ANSWER with Jury Demand against R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company by Meriliz Inc. Attorney Wiseman, Dylan W. added. (Attachments: #1 Counter-Claim)(Wiseman, Dylan) Modified on 11/4/2021 (Coll, A).
October 29, 2021 Filing 35 SEALED EVENT (Benson, A.)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/28/21 GRANTING #33 Request to Seal. (Benson, A.)
October 28, 2021 Filing 33 REQUEST TO SEAL pursuant to L.R. 141 by R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company. Attorney Hecht, Derek S. ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek S. Hecht, #2 Proposed Order) (Hecht, Derek)
October 27, 2021 Filing 32 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Meriliz Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mark A. Romeo* *Littler Mendelson, P.C.* *18565 Jamboree Rd., Suite 800* *Irvine, CA 92612*. (Huang, H)
October 26, 2021 Filing 31 REDACTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Pappas, III, Dome Printing by R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company. (Romeo, Mark)
October 21, 2021 Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy D. Weisel for District Judge John A. Mendez: Plaintiff shall file its redacted first amended complaint as a stand-alone document on the public docket forthwith. IT IS SO ORDERED. [TEXT ONLY ENTRY](Weisel, D)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/20/2021 ORDERING that Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, attached hereto as Exhibit A, shall be deemed filed and served as of the date that this Order is signed. It is further ORDERED that Dome Printing is added as a Defendant in this matter. Upon the entry of this order, Plaintiff shall file the unredacted version of Exhibit A with the Court pursuant to the Court's procedures for the filing of sealed documents, and within seven days of the entry of this order shall file a Motion to Seal the First Amended Complaint. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 18, 2021 Filing 28 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Leave to Amend Complaint by R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Romeo, Mark)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/21/2021 ORDERING: Expert Witness Disclosures due by 4/29/2022, with Supplemental Disclosure due by 5/13/2022, Joint Mid-Litigation Statements due 14 days prior to the close of discovery, Discovery to be completed by 7/1/2022, Dispositive Motions filed by 8/12/2022, with Hearing on 9/27/2022 at 1:30 PM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/2/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez, with a Joint Pretrial Statement due 7 days prior, and Jury Trial set for 1/30/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 7 days of the date of the filing of this Order.(Huang, H)
September 8, 2021 Filing 26 JOINT STATUS REPORT by R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company. (Romeo, Mark)
August 23, 2021 Filing 25 ANSWER with Jury Demand by John Pappas, III.(Wiseman, Dylan)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 08/09/21 DENYING Pappas's #16 Motion to Dismiss. (Benson, A.)
June 30, 2021 Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER: The motion now calendared for 7/6/2021 is SUBMITTED without appearance and without oral argument pursuant to Local Rule 230(g). Accordingly, the hearing on said motion is VACATED. If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. IT IS SO ORDERED. [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Michel, G.)
June 29, 2021 Filing 22 REPLY by John Pappas, III re #16 Motion to Dismiss. (Wiseman, Dylan)
June 25, 2021 Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER: The parties are ORDERED to file an updated Joint Status Report pursuant to the provisions of F.R.Cv.P. 16 and 26, in accordance with Local Rule 240 and the Court's Order Requiring Service of Process and Joint Status Report, within 30 days of the Court's ruling on Defendant's pending #16 Motion to Dismiss. [TEXT ENTRY ONLY] (Michel, G.)
June 25, 2021 Filing 20 JOINT STATUS REPORT by R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company. (Romeo, Mark)
June 22, 2021 Filing 19 OPPOSITION by R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company to #16 Motion to Dismiss. (Romeo, Mark)
June 21, 2021 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Anderson for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 06/21/2021: The informal conference previously set for June 23, 2021 (ECF No. 17 ) is hereby VACATED at the request of the parties. (Text Only Entry)(Anderson, J)
June 11, 2021 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Anderson for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 06/11/2021: The parties in this matter have requested an informal telephone conference. The conference is scheduled for 06/23/2021 at 10:00 a.m. At least 24 hours before the conference the parties shall submit a joint letter briefly explaining what meet and confer efforts have been undertaken and provide a synopsis of the discovery dispute. The joint letter brief shall be no more than 2 pages in length, including any exhibits or attachments (which are discouraged), and shall be in at least 12-point type. Pages exceeding this limit will not be considered. The letter shall be emailed to acorders@caed.uscourts.gov. No paper courtesy copy is required, and the letter should not be filed on the docket. The informal conference will be conducted via Zoom. The Judicial Assistant Donna Dal Porto will be sending you the zoom information shortly after you receive this minute order. (Text Only Entry) (Anderson, J)
May 17, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to DISMISS by John Pappas, III. Motion Hearing set for 7/6/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dylan Wiseman)(Wiseman, Dylan)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/5/2021.(Becknal, R)
May 4, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: John Pappas, III served on 4/27/2021, answer due 5/18/2021. (Romeo, Mark)
May 4, 2021 Filing 13 PROPOSED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company. (Romeo, Mark) Modified on 5/5/2021 (Kaminski, H).
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER re ENTRY OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/30/21. (Kaminski, H)
May 3, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company re #2 Summons, #5 Request to Seal, #1 Complaint, #3 Civil New Case Documents for JAM, #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Romeo, Mark)
April 29, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Entry of Preliminary Injunction by R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company. (Romeo, Mark)
April 28, 2021 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER re Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order re #4 Motion for TRO. (Romeo, Mark)
April 28, 2021 Filing 8 SEALED EVENT (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4) (Coll, A)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/27/2021 GRANTING #5 Request to Seal Portions of RRD's Complaint and Motion for TRO. (Coll, A)
April 27, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff filed a Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order on April 27, 2021. See ECF No. #4 . Defendant shall file any opposition by Monday, May 3, 2021. Plaintiff's reply brief is due by Friday, May 7, 2021. The Court will decide the motion on the papers. If a hearing becomes necessary, the parties will be notified. IT IS SO ORDERED. [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Michel, G.)
April 27, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST TO SEAL DOCUMENTS pursuant to L.R. 141 by R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Mark A. Romeo) (Romeo, Mark)
April 27, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Paul Horbal, #3 Declaration of Craig Roberton, #4 Declaration of Shane D. Shook, Ph.D., #5 Declaration of Mark A. Romeo, #6 Proposed Order, #7 TRO Checklist)(Romeo, Mark)
April 27, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
April 27, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *John Pappas, III* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mark A. Romeo* *Littler Mendelson, P.C.* *18565 Jamboree Rd., Suite 800* *Irvine, CA 92612*. (Benson, A.)
April 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Pappas III by R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company. Attorney Romeo, Mark A. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9566291) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Romeo, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company v. Pappas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Pappas, III
Represented By: Matthew Robert Richard
Represented By: Dylan W. Wiseman
Represented By: John Edward Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meriliz Inc. Doing business as Dome Printing
Represented By: Dylan W. Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PM Packaging
Represented By: John Edward Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company
Represented By: Mark A. Romeo
Represented By: Derek S. Hecht
Represented By: Linde Blocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Meriliz Inc.
Represented By: Dylan W. Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?