(PC) Muhammad v. Ross
Plaintiff: Kifa Muhammad and Marcus Johnson
Defendant: Sean Ross, City of Stockton and Wellpath Medical
Case Number: 2:2021cv00776
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Kifa Muhammad. (Rodriguez, E) Modified on 6/3/2021 (Plummer, M).
May 13, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST For Local Rules by Kifa Muhammad. (Reader, L) (Response sent: "The Eastern District of California Local Rules are available on the court website at www.caed.uscourts.gov.") Modified on 5/17/2021 (Henshaw, R).
May 13, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rodriguez, E)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/6/2021 DENYING without prejudice #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Henshaw, R)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/6/2021 ORDERING Plaintiff to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed IFP on the form provided by the Clerk or the required fees in the amount of $402.00. (Henshaw, R)
May 7, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order, #5 Order, and IFP application served on Kifa Muhammad. (Henshaw, R)
May 3, 2021 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 6/7/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Kaminski, H)
May 3, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, served on Kifa Muhammad. (Kaminski, H)
April 30, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Kifa Muhammad. (Kaminski, H)
April 30, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Sean Ross by Kifa Muhammad.(Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Muhammad v. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kifa Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?