Farmers Ins. Exchange et al v. PacifiCorp
Plaintiff: American Bankers Insurance Company, Nautilus Insurance Company, AMCO Insurance Company, a Nationwide Company, Farmers Specialty Insurance Company, California Fair Plan Association, Farmers Insurance Company of Oregon, Farmers Insurance Company of Idaho, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Fire Insurance Exchange, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance-NAIC, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Scottsdale Insurance Company and Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: PacifiCorp
Case Number: 2:2021cv00801
Filed: May 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Filing 32 MOTION to STRIKE #28 Reply. by PacifiCorp. Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dixon, Douglas) Modified on 6/25/2021 (Benson, A.).
June 23, 2021 Filing 31 LIMITED OPPOSITION by AMCO Insurance Company, et al., to #14 Motion to File an Amended Answer. (Bennett, Bonnie) Modified on 6/23/2021 (Benson, A.).
June 17, 2021 Filing 30 REPLY by PacifiCorp in support of #12 Motion for Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Response to Objections to #22 Request for Judicial Notice)(Dixon, Douglas) Modified on 6/22/2021 (Benson, A.).
June 17, 2021 Filing 29 REPLY by AMCO Insurance Company, et al., re #8 Motion to Amend the Complaint/Petition,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Craig S. Simon, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11 ,#13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13)(Simon, Craig) Modified on 6/22/2021 (Benson, A.).
June 17, 2021 Filing 28 REPLY by AMCO Insurance Company, et al., re #9 Motion to Remand,. (Simon, Craig) Modified on 6/22/2021 (Benson, A.).
June 11, 2021 Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE of DOCKET CORRECTION: PLEASE DISREGARD re: [ 25 ] Minute Order; REFER to Amended Minute Order at ECF No. [ 26 ] Vacating the correct hearing date of 6/24/2021. (York, M)
June 11, 2021 Filing 26 AMENDED [ 25 ] MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 6/24/2021 hearing on the Motion for Judgment on the Pleading #12 is VACATED and SUBMITTED without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is Denied as Moot. (York, M)
June 10, 2021 Filing 25 (DISREGARD; REFER TO AMENDED FILING AT ECF NO. [ 26 ]) - - MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 7/8/2021 hearing on the Motion for Judgment on the Pleading #12 is VACATED and SUBMITTED without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is Denied as Moot. (York, M)
June 10, 2021 Filing 24 OPPOSITION by PacifiCorp to #8 Motion to Amend the Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Decl of Derek Flores, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Dixon, Douglas) Modified on 6/11/2021 (Zignago, K.).
June 10, 2021 Filing 23 OPPOSITION by PacifiCorp to #9 Motion to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Decl of Derek Flores, #2 Ex 1)(Dixon, Douglas) Modified on 6/11/2021 (Zignago, K.).
June 10, 2021 Filing 22 OPPOSITION by plaintiffs to #12 Motion for Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Objection to Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Order)(Simon, Craig) Modified on 6/11/2021 (Zignago, K.).
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/3/2021 RELATING with case(s) 2:21-CV-801 MCE CKD and 2:21-CV-848 KJM AC. REASSIGNING CASE 2:21-CV-801 to Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney for all further proceedings. All dates currently set in this reassigned case only are hereby VACATED. Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, Magistrate Judge Allison Claire no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 2:21-CV-848 MCE CKD.(Reader, L)
June 3, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY by Plaintiffs to #19 Opposition. (Simon, Craig) Modified on 6/3/2021 (Kaminski, H).
June 3, 2021 Filing 19 OPPOSITION by PacifiCorp to #17 Ex Parte Application. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Derek Flores, #2 Exhibit 1)(Dixon, Douglas) Modified on 6/3/2021 (Kaminski, H).
June 2, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Bonnie Jean Bennett on behalf of Plaintiffs. Attorney Bennett, Bonnie Jean added. (Bennett, Bonnie) Modified on 6/3/2021 (Kaminski, H).
June 2, 2021 Filing 17 EX PARTE APPLICATION to EXTEND the HEARING DATE by Plaintiffs of Defendant PacifiCorp's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Craig S. Simon, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Proposed Order)(Simon, Craig) Modified on 6/3/2021 (Kaminski, H).
June 1, 2021 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 7/8/2021 hearing on the Motion for Leave to File an Amended Answer #14 is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
May 28, 2021 Filing 15 AMENDED #1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento Superior Court, case number 34-2021-00299634 by PacifiCorp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Douglas J. Dixon, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6 , #8 Exhibit 7). (Dixon, Douglas) Modified on 6/1/2021 (Kaminski, H).
May 28, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for LEAVE to FILE an AMENDED ANSWER by PacifiCorp. Motion Hearing set for 7/8/2021 at 02:00 PM before Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dixon, Douglas) Modified on 6/1/2021 (Kaminski, H).
May 24, 2021 Filing 13 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by PacifiCorp in re #12 Notice - Other. (Attachments: #1 Decl of Douglas J. Dixon, #2 Ex A, #3 Ex B, #4 Ex C, #5 Ex D, #6 Ex E, #7 Ex F)(Dixon, Douglas) Modified on 5/26/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
May 24, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADING by PacifiCorp. Motion hearing set for 6/24/2021 at 2:00 PM before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Dixon, Douglas) Modified on 5/26/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L). Modified on 6/10/2021 (Zignago, K.).
May 19, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 6/24/2021 hearing on the Motion to Remand #9 is VACATED and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
May 19, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 6/24/2021 hearing on the Motion to Amend the Notice of Removal #8 is VACATED and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
May 18, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to REMAND by AMCO Insurance Company, et al., Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Craig S. Simon, #2 Declaration of Christine Forsline, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Index of Exhibits)(Simon, Craig) Modified on 5/19/2021 (Zignago, K.).
May 18, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to AMEND the Complaint by AMCO Insurance Company, et al., Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Craig S. Simon, #2 Declaration of Christine Forsline, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Index of Exhibits)(Simon, Craig) Modified on 5/19/2021 (Zignago, K.).
May 18, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Simon, Craig)
May 18, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Craig Scott Simon on behalf of AMCO Insurance Company, a Nationwide Company, American Bankers Insurance Company, California Fair Plan Association, Farmers Insurance Company of Idaho, Farmers Insurance Company of Oregon, Farmers Insurance Exchange, Farmers Specialty Insurance Company, Fire Insurance Exchange, Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Mid-Century Insurance Company, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance-NAIC, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nautilus Insurance Company, Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Simon, Craig)
May 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:21-cv-00848 by PacifiCorp. (Dixon, Douglas)
May 4, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
May 4, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Derek R. Flores on behalf of PacifiCorp. Attorney Flores, Derek R. added. (Flores, Derek)
May 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Douglas James Dixon on behalf of PacifiCorp. (Dixon, Douglas)
May 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2021-00299634 by PacifiCorp. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9580787) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer to Complaint, #3 Dixon Declaration, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Jury Demand)(Dixon, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmers Ins. Exchange et al v. PacifiCorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Bankers Insurance Company
Represented By: Craig S. Simon, NCAED
Represented By: Bonnie Jean Bennett
Represented By: Craig Scott Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nautilus Insurance Company
Represented By: Craig S. Simon, NCAED
Represented By: Bonnie Jean Bennett
Represented By: Craig Scott Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMCO Insurance Company, a Nationwide Company
Represented By: Craig S. Simon, NCAED
Represented By: Bonnie Jean Bennett
Represented By: Craig Scott Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Craig S. Simon, NCAED
Represented By: Bonnie Jean Bennett
Represented By: Craig Scott Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Fair Plan Association
Represented By: Craig S. Simon, NCAED
Represented By: Bonnie Jean Bennett
Represented By: Craig Scott Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers Insurance Company of Oregon
Represented By: Craig S. Simon, NCAED
Represented By: Bonnie Jean Bennett
Represented By: Craig Scott Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers Insurance Company of Idaho
Represented By: Craig S. Simon, NCAED
Represented By: Bonnie Jean Bennett
Represented By: Craig Scott Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Craig S. Simon, NCAED
Represented By: Bonnie Jean Bennett
Represented By: Craig Scott Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Craig S. Simon, NCAED
Represented By: Bonnie Jean Bennett
Represented By: Craig Scott Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fire Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Craig S. Simon, NCAED
Represented By: Bonnie Jean Bennett
Represented By: Craig Scott Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance-NAIC
Represented By: Craig S. Simon, NCAED
Represented By: Bonnie Jean Bennett
Represented By: Craig Scott Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan
Represented By: Craig S. Simon, NCAED
Represented By: Bonnie Jean Bennett
Represented By: Craig Scott Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-Century Insurance Company
Represented By: Craig S. Simon, NCAED
Represented By: Bonnie Jean Bennett
Represented By: Craig Scott Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By: Craig S. Simon, NCAED
Represented By: Bonnie Jean Bennett
Represented By: Craig Scott Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Craig S. Simon, NCAED
Represented By: Bonnie Jean Bennett
Represented By: Craig Scott Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PacifiCorp
Represented By: Derek R. Flores
Represented By: Douglas James Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?