Lofton v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Consuello Lofton
Defendant: FCA US LLC, Elk Grove Dodge Chrysler Jeep Ram and FCA US, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01012
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/1/2022 DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). CASE CLOSED. (Coll, A)
May 31, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal with Prejudice by FCA US, LLC. Attorney Stuhlbarg, Richard L. added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stuhlbarg, Richard) Modified on 6/1/2022 (Zignago, K.).
January 29, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Tionna Dolin. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 18, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of DISASSOCIATION of COUNSEL by Consuello Lofton. (Dolin, Tionna)
November 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Simi Peterson on behalf of Consuello Lofton. (Peterson, Simi)
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 [NOT SIGNED - SEE #7 ] NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Simi Peterson on behalf of Consuello Lofton. Attorney Peterson, Simi added. (Peterson, Simi) Modified on 11/10/2021 (Benson, A.).
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by FCA US LLC. of #4 Civil New Case Documents (Koo, Jennifer) Modified on 7/8/2021 (Coll, A).
June 7, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
June 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by FCA US LLC. (Koo, Jennifer)
June 7, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by FCA US LLC (Koo, Jennifer)
June 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2020-00291061 by FCA US LLC. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9640388) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard Stuhlbarg , #2 Declaration of Jennifer C. Koo; Exhibits A-V)(Koo, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lofton v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consuello Lofton
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Simi Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Jennifer C. Koo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elk Grove Dodge Chrysler Jeep Ram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer C. Koo
Represented By: Richard L. Stuhlbarg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?