(UD)(PS) US Bank National Association v. Expose
Plaintiff: US Bank National Association
Defendant: Linda Rose Expose
Case Number: 2:2021cv01055
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Filing 8 APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re #7 Notice of Appeal filed by Linda Rose Expose. Notice of Appeal filed *8/11/2021*, Complaint filed *6/14/2021* and Appealed Order / Judgment filed *7/15/2021*. ** *Fee Status: Not Paid - Billed* Bill for fees due sent to *Linda Rose Expose* (Attachments: #1 Appeal Information, #2 Bill for Appeal Fee) (Coll, A)
August 12, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Appeal Processed to USCA served on Linda Rose Expose. (Coll, A)
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of APPEAL by Linda Rose Expose as to #5 Order. (Coll, A)
August 3, 2021 Filing 6 OBJECTIONS by Defendant Linda Rose Expose to #5 Order. (Tupolo, A)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/15/2021 DENYING #4 Motion For Reconsideration. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 15, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order served on Linda Rose Expose. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 OBJECTIONS by Defendant Linda Rose Expose to #3 Order and NOTICE of CLAIM against Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Coll, A)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/16/21 REMANDING this matter to Stanislaus County Superior Court and DENYING as MOOT #2 defendant's motion for in forma pauperis status. CASE CLOSED.Certified copy of remand order sent to other court. (Kastilahn, A)
June 17, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on Linda Rose Expose. (Kastilahn, A)
June 15, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Linda Rose Expose. (Becknal, R)
June 15, 2021 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Becknal, R)
June 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Stanislaus Superior Court, Case number UD-19-001533 filed by Linda Rose Expose.(Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (UD)(PS) US Bank National Association v. Expose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Bank National Association
Represented By: Donna LaPorte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Rose Expose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?