(PC) Briggs v. U.S.D.O.J. et al
Plaintiff: Vicki L. Briggs
Defendant: CDCR, Sac Sheriffs and U.S. D.O.J.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01127
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT by Vicki L. Briggs re #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE re FALSE CLAIM and records by Vicki L. Briggs. (Tupolo, A)
July 19, 2021 Filing 7 EXHIBIT G & H by Vicki L. Briggs. (Reader, L)
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to 124500 Bruceville, Elk Grove, CA 95858 by Vicki L. Briggs. (Reader, L)
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Reader, L)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/30/2021 ORDERING Plaintiff to submit, within 30 days from the date of service of this order, a certified trust account statement to complete her request for leave to proceed IFP. (Henshaw, R)
June 30, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order served on Vicki L. Briggs. (Henshaw, R)
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 8/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Becknal, R)
June 28, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Vicki L. Briggs. (Becknal, R)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Vicki L. Briggs. (Becknal, R)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Vicki L. Briggs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Briggs v. U.S.D.O.J. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki L. Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sac Sheriffs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. D.O.J.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?