(HC) Miles v. People of the State of California et al
Petitioner: Maurice Miles, Sr.
Respondent: People of the State of California and Scott Jones
Case Number: 2:2021cv01143
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gregory G Hollows
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/2/2021 ORDERING petitioner to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the appropriate filing fee, and DISMISSING petitioner's petition for writ of habeas corpus with leave to file an amended petition within 30 days. The Clerk shall send petitioner an ifp form an application for writ of habeas corpus. (Yin, K)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order with ifp and 2254 forms served on Maurice Miles Sr. (Yin, K)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to 6315 4th Ave, Los Angeles, CA 90043 by Maurice Miles, Sr. (Huang, H)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. The new case number is: 2:21-cv-1143 TLN GGH (HC). (Kastilahn, A)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 4 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Maurice Miles, Sr.. (Kastilahn, A)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kastilahn, A)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 8/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Zignago, K.)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Maurice Miles Sr.. (Zignago, K.)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 2241 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Scott Jones, People of the State of California by Maurice Miles, Sr. (Zignago, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Miles v. People of the State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: People of the State of California
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Jones
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maurice Miles, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?