Biba Restaurant, Inc. v. Chang et al
Plaintiff: Biba Restaurant, Inc.
Defendant: Karel Mulac, Penny Sheridan, June Chang, John Black and Mattone Ristorante
Case Number: 2:2021cv01150
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Biba Restaurant, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form Consent to Amendment of Complaint)(Escovedo, Joshua)
July 16, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER by John Black, June Chang, Mattone Ristorante, Karel Mulac, Penny Sheridan.(Wohl, Christopher)
July 9, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by John Black, June Chang, Mattone Ristorante, Karel Mulac, Penny Sheridan. (Wohl, Christopher)
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Kastilahn, A)
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by John Black, June Chang, Mattone Ristorante, Karel Mulac, Penny Sheridan (Wohl, Christopher)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2021-00302069 by All Defendants. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9673290) (Wohl, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biba Restaurant, Inc. v. Chang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karel Mulac
Represented By: Christopher Fredrick Wohl
Represented By: Larry M. Kazanjian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penny Sheridan
Represented By: Christopher Fredrick Wohl
Represented By: Larry M. Kazanjian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: June Chang
Represented By: Christopher Fredrick Wohl
Represented By: Larry M. Kazanjian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Black
Represented By: Christopher Fredrick Wohl
Represented By: Larry M. Kazanjian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mattone Ristorante
Represented By: Christopher Fredrick Wohl
Represented By: Larry M. Kazanjian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Biba Restaurant, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Heath Escovedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?