(PC) Parnell v. Wheeler et al
Plaintiff: J.P. Parnell
Defendant: Wheeler and Toure
Case Number: 2:2021cv01182
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL by J.P. Parnell. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: IFP pursuant to #9 Order Directing Prisoner Payment. (Yin, K)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from the Inmate Trust Account of J.P. Parnell signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/26/2021. The appropriate agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial) (Yin, K)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/26/2021 GRANTING plaintiff's #2 , #7 motions to proceed ifp; GRANTING plaintiff's #6 motion to supplement his complaint; and DISMISSING plaintiff's complaint with leave to file an amended complaint within 30 days. Plaintiff shall pay the $350.00 filing fee in accordance with the concurrent order. Failure to file an amended complaint in accordance with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Yin, K)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, #8 Order Dismissing Complaint with Leave to Amend served on J.P. Parnell. (Yin, K)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by J.P. Parnell. (Becknal, R) Modified on 8/19/2021 (Plummer, M).
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Supplement #1 Complaint by J.P. Parnell. (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 8/6/2021 (Plummer, M).
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Huang, H)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 07/12/2021 DIRECTING plaintiff to file a Motion for IFP or pay the filing fee within 30 days from the date of this order. (Rodriguez, E)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order and IFP Form served on J.P. Parnell. Modified on 7/14/2021 (Rodriguez, E).
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 8/12/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Kastilahn, A)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on J.P. Parnell. (Kastilahn, A)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by J.P. Parnell. (Kastilahn, A)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by J.P. Parnell.(Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Parnell v. Wheeler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.P. Parnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?