(HC) Harrell v. Lopez
Petitioner: Joshua Neil Harrell
Respondent: Frank Lopez
Case Number: 2:2021cv01227
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Filing 12 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #7 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Tami Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General. (Henshaw, R)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/23/2021. Consent or Decline due by 9/27/2021. (cc: Tami Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General) (Henshaw, R)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/23/2021 DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition within 60 days from the date of this order. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. (cc: Tami Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General) (Henshaw, R)
August 23, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order served on Joshua Neil Harrell. (Henshaw, R)
July 30, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Joshua Neil Harrell. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 30, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS: Exhibit A (1 disk) to Amended Petition by Joshua Neil Harrell. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 30, 2021 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS by Joshua Neil Harrell.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 26, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. The new case number is: 2:21-cv-1227-TLN-KJN. (Zignago, K.)
July 26, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: 6 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Joshua Neil Harrell. (Zignago, K.)
July 23, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Zignago, K.)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/19/2021 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP and DISMISSING #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus with leave to amend within 30 days from the date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
July 19, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order and court's form application for writ of habeas corpus served on Joshua Neil Harrell. (Henshaw, R)
July 14, 2021 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 8/16/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Becknal, R)
July 14, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Joshua Neil Harrell. (Becknal, R)
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Joshua Neil Harrell. (Becknal, R) Modified on 7/15/2021 (Plummer, M).
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus against Frank Lopez by Joshua Neil Harrell.(Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Harrell v. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joshua Neil Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Frank Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?