(PC) Payton v. Livingston et al
Plaintiff: Norbert Maurice Payton
Defendant: A. Livingston, N. Sylvan and M. Garcia
Case Number: 2:2021cv01316
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Filing 11 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: IFP served on the Director of CDCR pursuant to the #10 Order Directing Prisoner Payment. (Yin, K)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from the Prison Account of Norbert Maurice Payton signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/8/2021.The appropriate agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial) (Yin, K)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/8/2021 GRANTING plaintiff's #2 , #5 request to proceed ifp and ORDERING service is appropriate for M. Garcia, A. Livingston, N. Sylvan. Plaintiff shall pay the $350.00 filing fee in accordance with the concurrent order. The Clerk shall send plaintiff forms for service to be completed and returned within 30 days, along with the Notice of Submission.(Yin, K)
September 8, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 , #9 Orders along with 1 Summons, 3 USM-285 Forms, an instruction sheet and 1 copy of the 7/26/2021 complaint served on Norbert Maurice Payton. (Yin, K)
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Becknal, R)
July 30, 2021 Filing 7 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Norbert Maurice Payton. (Kastilahn, A)
July 30, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kastilahn, A)
July 30, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Norbert Maurice Payton. (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 8/3/2021 (Plummer, M).
July 28, 2021 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: (TEXT ONLY) The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Norbert Maurice Payton, CDC F-32144 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Plummer, M)
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *7/26/2021*; Consent or Decline due by 8/30/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Huang, H)
July 27, 2021 SERVICE BY E-MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Norbert Maurice Payton. (Huang, H)
July 26, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Norbert Maurice Payton. (Huang, H)
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against M. Garcia, A. Livingston, N. Sylvan by Norbert Maurice Payton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Huang, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Payton v. Livingston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norbert Maurice Payton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Sylvan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?