(HC) Turner v. Covello
Petitioner: Anthony Dewayne Lee Turner
Respondent: Unknown and Patrick Covello
Case Number: 2:2021cv01328
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REQUEST/MOTION for RECONSIDERATION re #7 Order by Anthony Dewayne Lee Turner. (Rodriguez, E)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: Amended Petition served on Tami Krenzin pursuant to #9 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition. (Yin, K)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 9/3/2021. (cc: Tami Krenzin) (Yin, K)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 9/2/2021 DIRECTING respondent to file a response to the amended petition within 60 days. The Clerk shall serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. The Clerk shall also update the docket to reflect that Patrick Covello is named as Respondent. (cc: Tami Krenzin) (Yin, K)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition served on Anthony Dewayne Lee Turner. (Yin, K)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS by Anthony Dewayne Lee Turner.(Kastilahn, A)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 8/9/2021 DISMISSING #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus with leave to amend; ORDERING Petitioner to file an amended petition on the form employed by this court within 30 days of the date of this order; and ORDERING Clerk to send Petitioner the Court's form habeas corpus application. (Henshaw, R)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 8/9/2021 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. (Henshaw, R)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order, #7 Order, and the Court's form habeas corpus application served on Anthony Dewayne Lee Turner. (Henshaw, R)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rodriguez, E)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Anthony Dewayne Lee Turner (Rodriguez, E)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERKS NOTICE (text only): The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Anthony Dewayne Lee Turner, CDCR# BJ-9612 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Yin, K)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 8/30/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Rodriguez, E)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Anthony Dewayne Lee Turner. (Rodriguez, E)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Unknown by Anthony Dewayne Lee Turner.(Rodriguez, E)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Anthony Dewayne Lee Turner. (Rodriguez, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Turner v. Covello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Dewayne Lee Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Patrick Covello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?