Nelson v. PHH Mortgage Corp.
Plaintiff: Carl E. Nelson
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 2:2021cv01372
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Morrison C England
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The Motion to Dismiss by PHH Mortgage Corporation at ECF No. 4 is noticed for an unavailable hearing date. Accordingly, and on the Courts own motion, the 10/6/2021 motion hearing is VACATED and RESET on 10/21/2021 and is also SUBMITTED pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the 10/21/2021 motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. For future filings, counsel is directed to find available civil law and motion calendar dates on the Court's website at www.caed.uscourts.gov by following these menu items: Judges, All Judges, United States District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (MCE), Standard Information (under the Case Management Procedures). Reservation of a hearing date is not required and all civil motions are at 2:00 p.m., in courtroom 7. (Deutsch, S)
September 22, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES by Carl E. Nelson in OPPOSITION to #4 Motion to Dismiss,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melinda Jane Steuer, #2 Request For Judicial Notice)(Steuer, Melinda) Modified on 9/23/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 30, 2021 Filing 7 [DISREGARD - Counsel to Refile] SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Carl E. Nelson. (Steuer, Melinda) Modified on 8/31/2021 (Huang, H).
August 27, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Johnson, Nicole)
August 27, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE in support of #4 Motion to Dismiss by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Johnson, Nicole) Modified on 8/30/2021 (Huang, H).
August 27, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to DISMISS by PHH Mortgage Corporation. Attorney Johnson, Nicole Michelle added. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Nicole)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Coll, A)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *PHH Mortgage Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Melinda Jane Steuer* *1107 Second Street* *Suite 230* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Coll, A)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PHH Mortgage Corporation by Carl E. Nelson. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9741449) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Steuer, Melinda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. PHH Mortgage Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl E. Nelson
Represented By: Melinda Jane Steuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Nicole Michelle Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?