California Rental Housing Assoc. et al v. Newsom et al
Plaintiff: California Rental Housing Association, Mary Montano and Trang Ho
Defendant: Gavin Newsom and Rob Bonta
Case Number: 2:2021cv01394
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Mendez
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER by Rob Bonta, Gavin Newsom.(Goldstein, Seth)
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME to Respond to the First Amended Complaint by Rob Bonta, Gavin Newsom. Attorney Goldstein, Seth Eden ADDED. (Goldstein, Seth)
August 13, 2021 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by California Rental Housing Association, Trang Ho, Mary Montano.(Beard, Paul)
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Reader, L)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Rob Bonta, Gavin Newsom* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Paul J. Beard, II* *FisherBroyles, LLP* *4470 W. Sunset Blvd., Suite 93165* *Los Angeles, California 90027*. (Reader, L)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, and Damages against All Defendants by California Rental Housing Association, Trang Ho, Mary Montano. Attorney Beard, Paul J. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9749044) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beard, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Rental Housing Assoc. et al v. Newsom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Rental Housing Association
Represented By: Paul J. Beard, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Montano
Represented By: Paul J. Beard, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trang Ho
Represented By: Paul J. Beard, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Represented By: Seth Eden Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Bonta
Represented By: Seth Eden Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?