Caldera v. Huhtamaki, Inc.
Plaintiff: Raymundo Caldera, III
Defendant: Huhtamaki, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01408
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Michael W. Nelson on behalf of Huhtamaki, Inc.. Attorney Nelson, Michael W. added. (Nelson, Michael)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/21/2021 GRANTING #6 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney James P. Smith, PHV for Huhtamaki, Inc.. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is DIRECTED to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Tupolo, A)
September 21, 2021 Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Huhtamaki, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-9830782) (Iskander, Gregory)
August 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of ERRATA by All Plaintiffs re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Khosrowshahi, Arash)
August 12, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Huhtamaki, Inc. re #3 Civil New Case Documents for TLN. (Kuzma, Natalie)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Tupolo, A)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Huhtamaki, Inc.. (Iskander, Gregory)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento Superior Court, case number 34-2021-00303152 by Huhtamaki, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9752364) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Gregory G Iskander (w/Exhibits A & B), #3 Declaration of Michael Dehlic, #4 Proof of Service)(Iskander, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caldera v. Huhtamaki, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymundo Caldera, III
Represented By: Arash S. Khosrowshahi
Represented By: Joshua S. Falakassa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huhtamaki, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory G. Iskander
Represented By: Natalie Marie Kuzma
Represented By: James P. Smith, PHV
Represented By: Michael W. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?