Noble v. Sutter Health et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Noble
Defendant: Sutter Health, Gould Medical Group, Inc., Sutter Gould Medical Foundation, Sutter Valley Medical Foundation, Inc, Sutter Memorial Medical Center, Lit K. Funk, Judy Fung and John Talieh
Case Number: 2:2021cv01433
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2022 Filing 28 REPLY by Sutter Health, Sutter Memorial Medical Center, Sutter Valley Medical Foundation, Inc re #26 Opposition to Motion. (Kitzes, Daniel)
February 9, 2022 Filing 27 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Sutter Health, Sutter Memorial Medical Center, Sutter Valley Medical Foundation, Inc. Attorney Kitzes, Daniel added. (Kitzes, Daniel)
February 3, 2022 Filing 26 OPPOSITION by Stephen Noble to #18 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table Outlining Arguments by Count, #2 Proposed Order)(Horowitz, Daniel)
January 21, 2022 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Sutter Gould Medical Foundation. (Cheung, Cynthia)
January 21, 2022 Filing 24 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Gould Medical Group, Inc..(Cheung, Cynthia)
January 21, 2022 Filing 23 ANSWER by Lit K. Funk. Attorney Posard, Mark added.(Posard, Mark)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 1/12/22 EXTENDING defendant Lit K. Fung's response to plaintiff's first amended complaint until 1/21/22. (Kastilahn, A)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 1/10/22 APPROVING the extension of time until 1/21/22, for GMG to file a response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. (Kastilahn, A)
January 11, 2022 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 2/24/2022 hearing on the Motion to Dismiss #18 is VACATED and SUBMITTED without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
January 10, 2022 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Sutter Gould Medical Foundation, Sutter Health, Sutter Memorial Medical Center, Sutter Valley Medical Foundation, Inc. (VanLandingham, Mitchell)
January 10, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to DISMISS by Sutter Gould Medical Foundation, et al. Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order)(VanLandingham, Mitchell) Modified on 1/12/2022 (Huang, H).
January 10, 2022 Filing 17 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time for Defenant The Gould Medical Group, Inc. to Respond to #5 First Amended Complaint by Gould Medical Group, Inc. Attorney Cheung, Cynthia Cheng added. (Cheung, Cynthia) Modified on 1/12/2022 (Huang, H).
January 7, 2022 Filing 16 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File a Response to #5 First Amended Complaint, by Lit K. Funk. Attorney Crowl, Patrick added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Crowl, Patrick) Modified on 1/10/2022 (Huang, H).
December 22, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION TO DISMISS re #14 Stipulation Corrected with Signatures by Stephen Noble. (Horowitz, Daniel) Modified on 12/29/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 20, 2021 Filing 14 [DISREGARD - Counsel to Refile with Signatures] STIPULATION to Dismiss Counts 2, 4-8 as to Lit K. Fung without prejudice by Stephen Noble. (Horowitz, Daniel) Modified on 12/21/2021 (Huang, H).
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/3/2021 EXTENDING to 1/10/2022, that defendants to file a response to the First Amended Complaint.(Reader, L)
November 30, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File a Response to #5 First Amended Complaint, by Sutter Gould Medical Foundation, et al. Attorney VanLandingham, Mitchell added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(VanLandingham, Mitchell) Modified on 12/1/2021 (Huang, H).
November 22, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Lit K. Funk served on 11/15/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. (Horowitz, Daniel)
November 22, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Sutter Memorial Medical Center served on 11/11/2021, answer due 12/2/2021. (Horowitz, Daniel)
November 22, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Sutter Health served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. (Horowitz, Daniel)
November 22, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Sutter Valley Medical Foundation, Inc served on 11/11/2021, answer due 12/2/2021. (Horowitz, Daniel)
November 22, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Sutter Gould Medical Foundation served on 11/11/2021, answer due 12/2/2021. (Horowitz, Daniel)
November 22, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Gould Medical Group, Inc. served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. (Horowitz, Daniel)
October 27, 2021 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lit K. Funk, Gould Medical Group, Inc., Sutter Gould Medical Foundation, Sutter Health, Sutter Memorial Medical Center, Sutter Valley Medical Foundation, Inc by Stephen Noble. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Horowitz, Daniel) Modified on 10/29/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 12, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Tupolo, A)
August 12, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Judy Fung, Lit K. Funk, Gould Medical Group, Inc., Sutter Gould Medical Foundation, Sutter Health, Sutter Memorial Medical Center, Sutter Valley Medical Foundation, Inc, John Talieh* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel A. Horowitz* *Law Office of Daniel Horowitz* *PO Box 1547* *Lafayette, CA 94549*. (Tupolo, A)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Stephen Noble. (Horowitz, Daniel).
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Stephen Noble. Attorney Horowitz, Daniel A. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9756998) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CV Dr. Noble, #2 Exhibit Memorandum of Understanding, #3 Exhibit Employment Contract, #4 Exhibit 2nd Restated Articles of Incorporation, #5 Exhibit Statement of Information, #6 Exhibit Statement of Information, #7 Exhibit Merger Documentation, #8 Exhibit Sutter Valley Medical Foundation, Inc art. of incorp, #9 Exhibit Sutter Health Amended and Restated Articles of Incorporation, #10 Exhibit Amended Articles, #11 Exhibit Cardiac Surgery Quality Dashboard, #12 Exhibit DFEH Right to Sue Letter)(Horowitz, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noble v. Sutter Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Noble
Represented By: Daniel A. Horowitz
Represented By: Charles Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sutter Health
Represented By: Daniel Kitzes
Represented By: Mitchell VanLandingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gould Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Cynthia Cheng Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sutter Gould Medical Foundation
Represented By: Mitchell VanLandingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sutter Valley Medical Foundation, Inc
Represented By: Mitchell VanLandingham
Represented By: Daniel Kitzes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sutter Memorial Medical Center
Represented By: Daniel Kitzes
Represented By: Mitchell VanLandingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lit K. Funk
Represented By: Mark Posard
Represented By: Patrick Crowl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Fung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Talieh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?