Darnell v. DeJoy
Plaintiff: Traci Darnell
Defendant: Louis DeJoy
Case Number: 2:2021cv01557
Filed: August 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Louis DeJoy served on 10/12/2021, answer due 11/2/2021. (Hines, Garrett)
September 13, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: All Defendants. (Hines, Garrett)
August 30, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Rodriguez, E)
August 30, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Louis DeJoy* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Garrett Hines* *Victim Compensation Law Group* *287 S. Robertson Blvd., # 302* *Beverly Hills, CA 90211*. (Rodriguez, E)
August 30, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Traci Darnell (Hines, Garrett)
August 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Louis DeJoy by Traci Darnell. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9792507) (Hines, Garrett).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darnell v. DeJoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traci Darnell
Represented By: Garrett Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis DeJoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?