(PC) Johnson v. Covello et al
Plaintiff: Sedric Eugene Johnson
Defendant: P. Couello, B. Holmes, E. Hobas, B. Cochran, J. Quiring, D. Clays, K. McTaggart, K. Mohr, J. Huro, E. Brazil and P. Covello
Case Number: 2:2021cv01605
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 OBJECTIONS to #11 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS by Plaintiff Sedric Eugene Johnson. (Rodriguez, E)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME by Sedric Eugene Johnson. (Rodriguez, E) Modified on 11/2/2021 (Plummer, M).
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 10/18/2021 RECOMMENDING plaintiff's #9 motion for ifp be denied and plaintiff be directed to pay the filing fees in full. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Findings and Recommendations served on Sedric Eugene Johnson. (Yin, K)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 10/13/2021 REASSIGNING CASE to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota for all further proceedings. New Case Number: 2:21-cv-1605 TLN DMC. (Rodriguez, E)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order Reassigning Case served on Sedric Eugene Johnson. (Rodriguez, E)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Sedric Eugene Johnson. (Rodriguez, E)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rodriguez, E)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PLAINTIFF'S ADDRESS UPDATED to CSP Los Angeles County, P.O. Box 4610, Lancaster, CA 93539 pursuant to Notice of Change of Address filed in 1:20-cv-00591-NONE-JLT (PC). (Jessen, A)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order re-served on Sedric Eugene Johnson to ECF No. 7 Updated Address. (Henshaw, R)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 9/13/2021 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, a complete ifp application with the required certified copy of his trust account statement or the appropriate filing fee. The Clerk to send plaintiff an ifp form. (Yin, K)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order and ifp form served on Sedric Eugene Johnson. (Yin, K)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 10/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Sant Agata, S)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the SACRAMENTO Division of the Eastern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 9/7/2021. New Case Number 2:21-cv-01605-DMC(PC). Old Case Number 1:21-cv-01336-HBK(PC).(Sant Agata, S)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #4 Order, served on Sedric Eugene Johnson. (Sant Agata, S)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: New Case Documents served on California Correctional Institution. (Sant Agata, S)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *9/7/2021*; Consent or Decline due by 10/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Sant Agata, S)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Sedric Eugene Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Johnson v. Covello et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sedric Eugene Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Couello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Hobas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Quiring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Clays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. McTaggart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Mohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Huro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Brazil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Covello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?