(PC) Hernandez v. Kibler et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Jesse Hernandez, Sr.
Defendant: Brian Kibler, Richard Gray, Rafael Miranda and M. Spearman
Case Number: 2:2021cv01629
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Andrew Jesse Hernandez, Sr. (Huang, H)
September 29, 2021 Filing 9 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Andrew Jesse Hernandez, Sr.. (Kastilahn, A)
September 29, 2021 Filing 8 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Andrew Jesse Hernandez, Sr, CDC G-10339 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (TEXT ONLY) (Plummer, M)
September 29, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: 5 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Andrew Jesse Hernandez Sr.. (Plummer, M)
September 28, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Senior Judge William B. Shubb and Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. The new case number is: 2:21-cv-1629 WBS JDP (PC). (Kastilahn, A)
September 27, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Andrew Jesse Hernandez, Sr. (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 9/29/2021 (Plummer, M).
September 27, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Andrew Jesse Hernandez, Sr. (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 9/29/2021 (Plummer, M).
September 27, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kastilahn, A)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 9/16/2021 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, either a properly completed ifp application or the required fees in the amount of $402.00. The Clerk shall send plaintiff an ifp application. (Yin, K)
September 16, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order and ifp application served on Andrew Jesse Hernandez Sr. (Yin, K)
September 13, 2021 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *9/10/2021*; Consent or Decline due by 10/18/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Tupolo, A)
September 13, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Andrew Jesse Hernandez Sr.. (Tupolo, A)
September 10, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Andrew Jesse Hernandez, Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tupolo, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Hernandez v. Kibler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Jesse Hernandez, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kibler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?