Chao v. County of Shasta et al
Plaintiff: Seing Chao
Defendant: County of Shasta and Tyler Finch
Case Number: 2:2021cv01819
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Tyler Finch. Attorney Habib, Mark A. added.(Habib, Mark)
November 15, 2021 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: Pursuant to the filing of the First Amended Complaint #9 , Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #7 is DENIED AS MOOT. The Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint #12 remains SUBMITTED. (Deutsch, S)
November 15, 2021 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 12/16/2021 hearing on the Motion to Dismiss #12 is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
November 12, 2021 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER re #12 Motion to Dismiss by County of Shasta. (Dunn, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/16/2021 (Benson, A.).
November 12, 2021 Filing 14 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by County of Shasta in re #12 Motion to Dismiss. (Dunn, Jeffrey)
November 12, 2021 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Daniel L. Richards in support of #12 Motion to Dismiss. (Dunn, Jeffrey)
November 12, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to DISMISS by County of Shasta. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (Dunn, Jeffrey)
November 10, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY by County of Shasta re #7 Motion to Dismiss,. (Dunn, Jeffrey)
November 4, 2021 Filing 10 OPPOSITION by Seing Chao to #7 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Shasta County Public Entities, #3 Email Meet and Confer)(Williams, Samuel).
October 28, 2021 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against County of Shasta, Tyler Finch by Seing Chao. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Samuel) Modified on 11/1/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
October 13, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 11/18/2021 hearing on the Motion to Dismiss #7 is VACATED and SUBMITTED without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
October 8, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to DISMISS by County of Shasta. Motion Hearing SET for 11/18/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pisano, Christopher) Modified on 10/15/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Daniel Lee Richards on behalf of County of Shasta. Attorney Richards, Daniel Lee added. (Richards, Daniel)
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Christopher M. Pisano on behalf of County of Shasta. Attorney Pisano, Christopher M. added. (Pisano, Christopher)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Kaminski, H)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by County of Shasta. (Dunn, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by County of Shasta (Dunn, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by County of Shasta. Attorney Dunn, Jeffrey Vincent added. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D). (Dunn, Jeffrey).
October 1, 2021 RECEIPT number #CAE200116846 $402.00 fbo County of Shasta by Nationwide Legal LLC on 10/1/2021. (Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chao v. County of Shasta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seing Chao
Represented By: Samuel C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Shasta
Represented By: Jeffrey Vincent Dunn
Represented By: Christopher M. Pisano
Represented By: Daniel Lee Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Finch
Represented By: Mark A. Habib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?