(HC) Elder v. Thompson et al
Petitioner: Robert P. Elder
Respondent: Paul Thompson, Federal Corretional Institution Herlong, Bureau of Prisons, Department of Justice and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv01836
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been assigned to Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. The new case number is: 2:21-cv-1836 KJM DMC. (Rodriguez, E)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 5 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Robert P. Elder. (Rodriguez, E)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rodriguez, E)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 10/13/2021 ORDERING respondents to file a response to petitioner's petition within 60 days from the date of service of this order. (Henshaw, R)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on Robert P. Elder. (Henshaw, R)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 11/8/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Rodriguez, E)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: CAED Receipt served on Robert P. Elder. (Kastilahn, A)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Robert P. Elder. (Rodriguez, E)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number #CAE200116874 $5.00 fbo Robert P. Elder by Robert P. Elder on 10/5/2021. (Kastilahn, A)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 2241 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against United States of America, Bureau of Prisons, Federal Corretional Institution Herlong, Paul Thompson, Department of Justice by Robert P. Elder.(Rodriguez, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Elder v. Thompson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert P. Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Paul Thompson
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Federal Corretional Institution Herlong
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bureau of Prisons
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Justice
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?