(HC) Harris v. Perry
Petitioner: Mark A. Harris
Respondent: Suzanne M. Perry and Suzanne M. Peery
Case Number: 2:2021cv01854
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to respond to #6 Order to Show Cause, by Mark A. Harris. (Huang, H)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/5/2021 ORDERING petitioner to show cause in writing, within 30 days, why his petition should not be dismissed as outside the core of federal habeas jurisdiction. The response to this Order to Show Cause must state whether or not petitioner has already been found suitable for parole by the Board of Parole Hearings. If so, petitioner must provide a copy of the Board's final decision, as well as documentation to support any representations about the effect on his anticipated release date of the 61-day credit forfeiture alleged in the petition. (Yin, K)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order to Show Cause served on Mark A. Harris. (Yin, K)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number #CAE200117380 $5.00 fbo Mark A. Harris by State of California on 10/28/2021. (Huang, H)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. The new case number is: 2:21-cv-1854-JAM-AC (HC). (Huang, H) Modified on 10/22/2021 (Huang, H).
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 5 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Mark A. Harris. (Huang, H)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Huang, H)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/19/2021 ORDERING petitioner to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the appropriate filing fee. The Clerk shall send petitioner an ifp form. (Yin, K)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order and ifp form served on Mark A. Harris. (Yin, K)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 11/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Kastilahn, A)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Mark A. Harris. (Kastilahn, A)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Suzanne M. Perry by Mark A. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Harris v. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark A. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Suzanne M. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Suzanne M. Peery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?