(HC) Aroz v. Covello
Petitioner: Alex Aroz
Respondent: Patrick Covello
Case Number: 2:2021cv01934
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT as to Alex Aroz (Reader, L)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Alex Aroz. (Reader, L)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERKS NOTICE (text only): The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Alex Aroz, CDCR# BC-3685 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Yin, K)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Alex Aroz. (Huang, H)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/29/2021 GRANTING #11 Motion for Extension of Time; ORDERING petitioner to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, the application to proceed IFP on the form provided by the Clerk or the filing fee in the amount of $5.00; ORDERING if petitioner intends to file an amended petition, such amended petition to be filed within 30 days from the date of this order; and ORDERING clerk to send petitioner the court's form for filing a petition for writ of habeas corpus and the application to proceed IFP by a prisoner. (Henshaw, R)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Order, the court's form for filing a petition for writ of habeas corpus, and the application to proceed IFP by a prisoner served on Alex Aroz. (Henshaw, R)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME by Alex Aroz. (Kaminski, H) Modified on 11/24/2021 (Plummer, M).
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REQUEST for copies of petition and fees by Alex Aroz. (Reader, L)(Response sent: "The Clerk's Office will provide copies of documents and of the docket sheet at $0.50 per page. The November 2, 2021 petition for writ of habeas corpus is 319 pages long. See above about obtaining copies of documents. ") Modified on 11/10/2021 (Plummer, M).
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. The new case number is: 2:21-cv-1934-TLN-KJN. (Coll, A)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Alex Aroz. (Coll, A)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS by Alex Aroz. (Coll, A) Modified on 11/10/2021 (Plummer, M).
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST for CLARIFICATION and COPIES by Alex Aroz. (Coll, A)(Response sent: "The Clerk's Office will provide copies of documents and of the docket sheet at $0.50 per page.") Modified on 11/4/2021 (Plummer, M).
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Coll, A)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/02/21 DENYING #1 , #3 Motions to stay. Within 30 days, petitioner shall file a petition that complies with the requirements of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and the Local Rules of Practice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send petitioner the courts form for filing a petition for writ of habeas corpus, and the application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner. (Plummer, M)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order on Motion to Stay, with habeas petition and prisoner IFP forms served on Alex Aroz. (Plummer, M)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST for COPIES and GUIDANCE re #3 Motion to Stay by Alex Aroz. (Coll, A) (Response sent - The Clerk's Office will provide copies of documents and of the docket sheet at $0.50 per page.) Modified on 10/28/2021 (Yin, K).
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to STAY by Alex Aroz. (Coll, A)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 11/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Coll, A)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Alex Aroz. (Coll, A)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Patrick Covello by Alex Aroz. (Coll, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Aroz v. Covello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alex Aroz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Patrick Covello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?