(PS) Kaura v. United States Postal Service
Plaintiff: Punam A. Kaura
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Case Number: 2:2021cv01942
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/2/2021 VACATING the 12/8/2021 Motion to Dismiss Hearing and DIRECTING plaintiff within 14 days from the date of this order, to SHOW CAUSE in writing why plaintiff's failure to oppose defendant's Motion to Dismiss should not waive the right to oppose the motion and why this action should not be dismissed. (Coll, A)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order to Show Cause served on Punam A. Kaura. (Coll, A)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Streeter for Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/22/2021: Due to a clerical error, the available dates provided in Minute Order (ECF No. 7 ) were incorrect. Therefore, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #8 ) is HEREBY RESCHEDULED to 12/8/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Text Only Entry)(Streeter, J)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to DISMISS by United States Postal Service. Motion Hearing SET for 12/9/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Kimberly Herbst, #3 Proof of Service)(Davidson, Rachel) Modified on 11/1/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Streeter for Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/22/2021: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #6 . The motion is noticed for hearing on 12/10/2021, which is not an available law and motion date. Defendant is directed to re-notice the Motion to Dismiss for one of the following available dates: 12/2/2021, 12/9/2021 or 12/16/2021 at 10:00 AM. before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. Accordingly the hearing date of 12/10/2021 is VACATED. (Text Only Entry) (Streeter, J)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 7 Minute Order served on Punam A. Kaura. (Streeter, J)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 9 Minute Order served on Punam A. Kaura. (Streeter, J)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to DISMISS by United States Postal Service. Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Kimberly Herbst, #3 Proof of Service)(Davidson, Rachel)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/21/2021: The court is in receipt of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #3 . The motion, as filed, is defective. Defendant is directed to comply with Local Rules 302(c)(21) and 230(a) and re-notice the motion before the assigned Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, the 11/19/2021 Motion Hearing set before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller is VACATED. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: Minute Order, filed at ECF No. 5, served on Punam A. Kaura. (Schultz, C)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Davidson, Rachel)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to DISMISS by United States Postal Service. Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Kimberly Herbst, #3 Proof of Service)(Davidson, Rachel)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Huang, H)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Small Claims, case number 21SC01847 by United States Postal Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davidson, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Kaura v. United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Punam A. Kaura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Represented By: Rachel R. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?