(PC) Pelton v. Amador County, California
Plaintiff: Sean Michael Pelton
Defendant: Amador County, California
Case Number: 2:2021cv01968
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT SERVICE DOCUMENTS and USM-285 Forms signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 12/13/21. Service is appropriate for Amador County, California. Clerk to send plaintiff: 1 Summons, 1 USM-285 Form, and 1 copy of the Complaint filed on 10/22/21 to be completed and returned with the notice of submission of documents within 30 days. (Plummer, M)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 12/13/21 GRANTING #2 , #7 Motions to Proceed IFP. The Court's #6 December 1, 2021, order is vacated as having been issued in error. (Plummer, M)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, served on Sean Michael Pelton. (Plummer, M)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Service Documents Order, 1 summons, instruction sheet, 1 USM-285 form and 1 copy of the complaint served on Sean Michael Pelton. (Plummer, M)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Sean Michael Pelton. (Reader, L)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 [VACATED PURSUANT TO 12/14/21 ORDER]ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 12/1/2021 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall submit on the form provided by the Clerk of the Court, within 30 days from the date of this order, a complete application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, with the required certified copy of his trust account statement, or the appropriate filing fee. (Huang, H) Modified on 12/14/2021 (Plummer, M).
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order and IFP Application served on Sean Michael Pelton. (Huang, H)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rodriguez, E)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rodriguez, E)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 11/29/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Rodriguez, E)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Sean Michael Pelton. (Rodriguez, E)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Sean Michael Pelton. (Rodriguez, E)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Amador County, California by Sean Michael Pelton.(Rodriguez, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Pelton v. Amador County, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Michael Pelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amador County, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?