Corbera v. Taylor
Plaintiff: Wesley Corbera
Defendant: Henry James Taylor
Case Number: 2:2021cv01998
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Michael Kipp Mueller on behalf of Wesley Corbera. Attorney Mueller, Michael Kipp added. (Mueller, Michael)
December 21, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Limited Stay of Discovery by Henry James Taylor. (Andrijich, Caitlyn)
December 21, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Henry James Taylor. Attorney Andrijich, Caitlyn I. added.(Andrijich, Caitlyn)
November 15, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Henry James Taylor on 10/29/2021. (Fiol, David) Modified on 11/18/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Fiol, David)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/14/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Coll, A)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Henry James Taylor* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David Lee Fiol* *2100 4th Street* *Suite C 287* *San Rafael, CA 94901*. (Coll, A)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Henry James Taylor by Wesley Corbera. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9901261) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fiol, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corbera v. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Corbera
Represented By: David Lee Fiol
Represented By: Joseph Peter Brent
Represented By: Michael Kipp Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry James Taylor
Represented By: Caitlyn I. Andrijich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?