(PS) Thomas v. Haire et al
Plaintiff: Jason Latrell Thomas
Defendant: Serena J. Haire and Joquesha Haire
Case Number: 2:2021cv02003
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jason Latrell Thomas. (Huang, H)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/17/2021 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an application in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court, or the required fees in the amount of $402.00. (Henshaw, R)
November 17, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order and a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner served on Jason Latrell Thomas. (Henshaw, R)
November 15, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). After initial screening this case is deemed as a Pro Se action. This case has been assigned to District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. The new case number is 2:21-cv-2003 JAM AC (PS). (Yin, K)
November 15, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: ECF No. 5, Clerk's Notice served on Jason Latrell Thomas. (Yin, K)
November 10, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Benson, A.)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *10/29/2021*; Consent or Decline due by 12/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Benson, A.)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 EMERGENCY MOTION for INJUNCTION by Jason Latrell Thomas. (Benson, A.)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jason Latrell Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Benson, A.)
October 29, 2021 SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Jason Latrell Thomas. (Benson, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Thomas v. Haire et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Latrell Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serena J. Haire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joquesha Haire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?