Castorina v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: John Castorina
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A. and Integon National Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv02004
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/17/21 ORDERING that BANA shall answer or respond to the Complaint on or before 1/12/22; and should BANA move to dismiss the Complaint, Plaintiff's response brief will be due on or before 2/23/22, and BANA's reply brief will be due on or before 3/16/22. Hearing on said motion (if filed) shall be set for 3/21/22 at 1:30 p.m. The Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED to 5/9/2022 at 12:30 PM. in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. A joint status report shall be filed no later than 4/25/22. (Kastilahn, A)
November 16, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint and Set Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss by Bank of America, N.A.. Attorney Pao, William K. added. (Pao, William)
November 12, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Integon National Insurance Company served on 11/3/2021. (Stewart, Dennis) Modified on 11/18/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
November 12, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Bank of America, N.A. served on 11/3/2021. (Stewart, Dennis) Modified on 11/18/2021 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/01/2021 GRANTING #6 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Scott D. Hirsch, PHV for John Castorina. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Rodriguez, E)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/01/2021 GRANTING #4 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Daniel E. Gustafson, PHV for John Castorina. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Rodriguez, E)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/01/2021 GRANTING #5 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney David A. Goodwin, PHV for John Castorina. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Rodriguez, E)
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by John Castorina for attorney Scott D. Hirsch to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-9904679) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Stewart, Dennis)
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by John Castorina for attorney David A. Goodwin to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-9904670) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Stewart, Dennis)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by John Castorina for attorney Daniel E. Gustafson to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-9904652) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Stewart, Dennis)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/14/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Coll, A)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Bank of America, N.A., Integon National Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Dennis Stewart* *600 B Street* *17th Floor* *San Diego, CA 92101*. (Coll, A)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank of America, N.A., Integon National Insurance Company by John Castorina. Attorney Stewart, Dennis added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9902609) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stewart, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castorina v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Castorina
Represented By: Dennis Stewart
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson, PHV
Represented By: David A. Goodwin, PHV
Represented By: Scott D. Hirsch, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: William K. Pao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integon National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?