Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.255.99.109
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.255.99.109
Case Number: 2:2021cv02034
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/22/2021 GRANTING #6 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena. Status report is due within 45 days. (Rodriguez, E)
November 17, 2021 Filing 6 EX PARTE APPLICATION by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC for Third-Party Subpoena. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit A-D, #3 Proposed Order)(Bandlow, Lincoln)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COPYRIGHT NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Copyright #1:* PA0002243645 * * Info Hash: 8A1BA4467DC7B820061A3DCC7CBE958DB1AC9E23 * * Vixen * Copyright #2:* See attached list of total works infringed * * * * * ; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Copyright Report, #3 VDRP) (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 11/4/2021 (Kastilahn, A).
November 4, 2021 Filing 4 (DISREGARD and REFER to #5 Amended Copyright New Case Documents Issued) COPYRIGHT NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Copyright #1:* PA0002243645 * * Info Hash: 8A1BA4467DC7B820061A3DCC7CBE958DB1AC9E23 * * Vixen * Copyright #2:* See attached list of total works infringed * * * * * ; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/10/2022 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 Copyright Report, #4 VDRP) (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 11/4/2021 (Kastilahn, A).
November 3, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.255.99.109 by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Attorney Bandlow, Lincoln Dee added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9911063) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Copyright Report)(Bandlow, Lincoln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.255.99.109
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lincoln Dee Bandlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.255.99.109
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?