Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 99.187.124.142
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 99.187.124.142
Case Number: 2:2021cv02071
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2022 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/4/2022: Pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (ECF No. #5 ) and FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i), this case is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
January 4, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/30/2021 GRANTING #3 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Plaintiff may engage in limited expedited discovery to establish the identity of the owner of the IP address identified in the complaint. Not later than 45 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall file a Status Report. (Rodriguez, E)
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 EX PARTE APPLICATION by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC for Third-Party Subpoena. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit A-D, #3 Proposed Order)(Bandlow, Lincoln)
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 COPYRIGHT NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Copyright #1:* PA0002296920 * * Hash: A1E1A3C583B67DD01750FA4D4D932F440E49B6EF * * Blacked Raw * Copyright #2:* See attached list of total works infringed * * * * * ; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Copyright Report, #3 VDRP, #4 Infringement list) (Kaminski, H)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement - Demand for Jury Trial against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 99.187.124.142 by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Attorney Bandlow, Lincoln Dee added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9917998) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint & Copyright Report, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Copyright Report, #4 Notice of Interested Parties, #5 Notice of Filing Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement)(Bandlow, Lincoln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 99.187.124.142
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lincoln Dee Bandlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 99.187.124.142
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?