(PC) Pavao v. Unknown
Plaintiff: Enrico Pavao
Defendant: John and Jane Doe 1-20 and Unknown
Case Number: 2:2021cv02082
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. The new case number is: 2:21-cv-2082-TLN-AC (PC). (Huang, H)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 8 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Enrico Pavao. (Huang, H)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Huang, H)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Enrico Pavao. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERKS NOTICE (text only): The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Enrico Pavao, CDCR# BL-7923 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Yin, K)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Consent or Decline due by 12/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Jessen, A)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/10/2021. New Case Number 2:21-cv-02082-AC (PC). Old Case Number 1:21-cv-01635-EPG (PC). (Jessen, A)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order, #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Enrico Pavao. (Jessen, A)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Enrico Pavao. (Jessen, A)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Enrico Pavao. (Jessen, A)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against John and Jane Doe 1-20 by Enrico Pavao. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Pavao v. Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrico Pavao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?