Natarajan v. Dignity Health
Plaintiff: Sundar Natarajan
Defendant: Dignity Health
Case Number: 2:2021cv02106
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Morrison C England
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Filing 9 CASE CLOSED (text only entry): Pursuant to #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal this case is CLOSED. (Huang, H)
January 7, 2022 Filing 8 REQUEST to Take Off-Calendar #5 Motion for Sanctions by Dignity Health. (Landsberg, Barry) Modified on 1/10/2022 (Huang, H).
January 7, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Sundar Natarajan. (Natarajan, Tara)
December 20, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 1/27/2022 hearing on the Motion for Sanctions #5 is VACATED and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
December 17, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for SANCTIONS by Dignity Health. Attorney Landsberg, Barry Scott added. Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Craig S. Rutenberg, #2 Request for Judicial Notice)(Landsberg, Barry) Modified on 12/21/2021 (Huang, H).
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
November 15, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Dignity Health* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Tara Natarajan* *10382 Westacres Drive* *Cupertino, CA 95014*. (Benson, A.)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Sundar Natarajan (Natarajan, Tara)
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dignity Health by Sundar Natarajan. Attorney Natarajan, Tara added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9926173) (Natarajan, Tara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natarajan v. Dignity Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sundar Natarajan
Represented By: Tara Natarajan, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dignity Health
Represented By: Barry Scott Landsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?