(PC) Fayed v. Allison, et al.
Plaintiff: James Michael Fayed
Defendant: Kathleen Allison and County of Los Angeles, California
Case Number: 2:2021cv02141
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/5/2022 DENYING #15 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Henshaw, R)
January 5, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #18 Order served on James Michael Fayed. (Henshaw, R)
December 29, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to Amend by James Michael Fayed. (Coll, A)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 12/22/2021 GRANTING #16 Motion for Extension of Time and ORDERING Plaintiff to file first amended complaint within 60 days of the date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
December 27, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #17 Order served on James Michael Fayed. (Henshaw, R)
December 17, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for 90-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to File Amended Complaint by James Michael Fayed. (Kaminski, H) Modified on 12/21/2021 (Plummer, M).
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 12/2/2021 DISMISSING plaintiff's original complaint with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall file a first amended complaint within 30 days. (Yin, K)
December 3, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #14 Order Dismissing Complaint with Leave to Amend served on James Michael Fayed. (Yin, K)
December 2, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by James Michael Fayed. (Kastilahn, A)
December 1, 2021 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kastilahn, A)
December 1, 2021 Filing 12 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: IFP application #5 served on Director of CDC. (Plummer, M)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of James Michael Fayed signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 12/01/21. CDC shall collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 12/01/21 GRANTING #5 Motion to Proceed IFP. (Plummer, M)
December 1, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, served on James Michael Fayed. (Plummer, M)
December 1, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on James Michael Fayed. (Plummer, M)
November 23, 2021 Filing 9 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by James Michael Fayed. (Rodriguez, E)
November 19, 2021 Filing 8 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for James Michael Fayed, CDC AK-3340 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Henshaw, R)
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Consent or Decline due within 30 days. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Rivera, O)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:21-cv-08912.
November 19, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on James Michael Fayed. (Rivera, O)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 18, 2021. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 11/19/2021.]
November 17, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by James Michael Fayed, CDCR # AK3340.The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2021) [Transferred from cand on 11/19/2021.]
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by James Michael Fayed. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2021) [Transferred from cand on 11/19/2021.]
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 ***DISREGARD. ERROR IN FILING. SEE DOCKET #5 FOR CORRECTED FILING*** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by James Michael Fayed. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2021) Modified on 11/18/2021 (jml, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 11/19/2021.]
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kathleen Allison, County of Los Angeles, California. Filed byJames Michael Fayed. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2021) [Transferred from cand on 11/19/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Fayed v. Allison, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Michael Fayed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Los Angeles, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?