Kieny et al v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Laurel Kieny and Stephanie Kieny
Defendant: FCA US LLC and FCA US, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv02145
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
2 Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2022 Filing 29 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Laurel Kieny, Stephanie Kieny. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STANDING ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/25/2022. (Donati, J)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The Court having considered the equitable division and efficient and economical determination of court business, hereby reassigns this case from District Judge *Kimberly J. Mueller* to * District Judge Dale A. Drozd* for all further proceedings. (Donati, J)
July 12, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of FCA US, LLC. (Hugret, Spencer)
July 12, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by James P. Mayo on behalf of FCA US, LLC. (Mayo, James)
June 15, 2022 Filing 24 STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/15/2022. (Schultz, C)
June 15, 2022 Filing 23 MINUTES for Scheduling Conference held (via videoconference) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/15/2022, and FRCP 16 BENCH ORDER: Plaintiffs' Counsel, Daniel Law, present. Defendant's Counsel, James Mayo, present. The court and counsel discussed case scheduling. After careful consideration of the parties' comments, the court ORDERED the following pre-trial case schedule: The parties shall file any proposed discovery only protective order by 6/29/2022; Initial disclosures as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a) shall be completed by 6/29/2022; fact discovery shall be completed by 4/24/2023; expert disclosures shall be completed by 5/1/2023; rebuttal expert witnesses shall be exchanged by 5/22/2023; all expert discovery shall be completed by 6/26/2023; and all dispositive motions, except for motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders or other emergency applications, shall be heard by 8/25/2023. Motions regarding discovery shall be noticed before the Magistrate Judge, as provided by Local Rule 302(c). After consideration of the parties' comments related to settlement, the parties shall file a joint status report on their private mediation efforts by 12/16/2022, informing the court whether mediation has been completed or if the court need to set a new status date. The parties will notify the court whether they request a court settlement conference date or referral to the Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program (VDRP) prior to any final pretrial conference. The parties shall file said notification or request for referral jointly, in writing. This case schedule will become final without further order of the court unless objections are filed within fourteen (14) calendar days of this order. The schedule, once final, shall not be modified except by leave of court upon showing of good cause. All provisions of the court's standing scheduling order for Civil Cases filed concurrently herewith are incorporated therein. SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Jennifer Coulthard. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
June 15, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Daniel Albert Law on behalf of Laurel Kieny, Stephanie Kieny. (Law, Daniel)
June 7, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
June 7, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by James P. Mayo on behalf of FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mayo, James)
June 7, 2022 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/7/2022: Due to a scheduling conflict and on the court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for 6/16/2022 is ADVANCED to 6/15/2022 at 1:00 PM before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. The 6/15/2022 Hearing will proceed by video conferencing through the Zoom application. The Courtroom Deputy will provide counsel with the hearing access information no less than 24 hours before the hearing. (Text Only Entry (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
June 7, 2022 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/7/2022: Defendant FCA US LLC's Proposed Substitution of Attorney, ECF No. #16 , is GRANTED. Accordingly, Attorney, Spencer P. Hugret, is SUBSTITUTED as counsel of Record for Defendant in place of Attorneys James P. Mayo and Jon D. Universal. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
June 2, 2022 Filing 17 JOINT RULE 26 REPORT by Laurel Kieny, Stephanie Kieny. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel) Modified on 6/3/2022 (Huang, H).
June 2, 2022 Filing 16 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by FCA US, LLC. (Mayo, James)
May 10, 2022 Filing 15 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Tionna Dolin for Laurel Kieny, Stephanie Kieny. Attorney Karin Kuemerle terminated (Dolin, Tionna) Modified on 5/12/2022 (Rodriguez, E).
April 26, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ariel Harman-Holmes on behalf of Laurel Kieny, Stephanie Kieny. Attorney Harman-Holmes, Ariel added. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
April 5, 2022 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/5/2022: On the court's own motion, a Scheduling Conference is SET for 6/16/2022 at 2:30 PM before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. The parties shall file a joint status report no less than fourteen (14) days prior. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
March 28, 2022 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Karin Kuemerle in RESPONSE to 7 Minute Order. (Kuemerle, Karin) Modified on 3/29/2022 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
March 23, 2022 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Mayo, James)
March 23, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jon D. Universal on behalf of FCA US, LLC. Attorney Universal, Jon D. added. (Universal, Jon)
March 23, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by FCA US, LLC. (Mayo, James)
March 23, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER with Jury Demand by FCA US, LLC. Attorney Mayo, James P. added. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Notice of Appearance James P. Mayo)(Mayo, James) Modified on 3/23/2022 (Reader, L).
March 14, 2022 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/14/2022: Defendant has not yet appeared in this action. As of today's date, no further action has been taken by Plaintiffs to complete litigation of this case. Accordingly, Plaintiffs shall file a declaration as to the status of this case within fourteen (14) days. If Plaintiffs file a motion for default judgment in accordance with the Local Rule 302(c)(19), a declaration need not be filed. The Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 3/24/2022 is VACATED and will be reset as appropriate. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
March 4, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Karin Kuemerle on behalf of Laurel Kieny, Stephanie Kieny. Attorney Kuemerle, Karin added. (Kuemerle, Karin)
March 2, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: FCA US, LLC served on 3/2/2022, answer due 3/23/2022. (Dolin, Tionna)
January 29, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Tionna Dolin. (Dolin, Tionna)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/24/2022 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Huang, H)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *FCA US LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Tionna Dolin* *Strategic Legal Practices, APC* *1840 Century Park East, Suite 430* *Los Angeles, CA 90067*. (Huang, H)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violation of Statutory Obligations against FCA US LLC by Laurel Kieny, Stephanie Kieny. Attorney Dolin, Tionna added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BCAEDC-9937069) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kieny et al v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurel Kieny
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Daniel Albert Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Kieny
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Daniel Albert Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: James P. Mayo
Represented By: Jon D. Universal
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?