Gordon v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Paul Gordon
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv02175
Filed: November 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2023 Filing 22 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Continue Expert Discovery Deadlines (Third Request) by Paul Gordon. Attorney Tracy, Michael Lion added. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Tracy, Michael)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 3/8/2023 CONTINUING the trial dates and related deadlines as follows: Initial Expert Disclosures due by 6/2/2023; Supplemental Expert Disclosures due by 6/16/2023; Discovery cut-off due by 7/14/2023; Dispositive Motions filed by 9/8/2023; Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez; Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez; and Jury Trial set for 2/26/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez. (Perdue, C.)
March 1, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Caitlin J. Scott on behalf of Paul Gordon. Attorney Scott, Caitlin J. added. (Scott, Caitlin)
February 27, 2023 Filing 19 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Trial Dates and Related Deadlines by Paul Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ariel Harman-Holmes, #2 Proposed Order)(Harman-Holmes, Ariel) Modified on 3/1/2023 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
January 10, 2023 Filing 18 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE, attorney Steven Whang terminated (Dolin, Tionna)
December 15, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Nino Sanaia on behalf of Paul Gordon. Attorney Sanaia, Nino added. (Sanaia, Nino)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 11/30/22 RESETTING the following dates: Initial Expert disclosures: 03/03/23 with supplemental disclosures due: 03/17/23; discovery cutoff: 04/14/23; last day to file dispositive motions: 05/26/23 and heard 07/25/23 at 1:30 p.m.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez and Jury Trial set for 11/27/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Senior Judge John A. Mendez. (Benson, A.)
November 29, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Steven Whang on behalf of Paul Gordon. (Whang, Steven)
November 29, 2022 Filing 14 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to continue trial by Paul Gordon. Attorney Whang, Steven added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Whang, Steven) Modified on 11/30/2022 (Coll, A).
May 10, 2022 Filing 13 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Tionna Dolin for Paul Gordon, attorney Karin Kuemerle terminated (Dolin, Tionna)
April 26, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ariel Harman-Holmes on behalf of Paul Gordon. Attorney Harman-Holmes, Ariel added. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 02/24/22 ORDERING that all Dispositive Motions be filed by 02/24/23 and heard 04/25/23 at 1:30 p.m.; Discovery completed by 01/13/23; joint mid-litigation statements due 14 days prior to close of discovery; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 12/02/22 with any supplemental/rebuttal expert disclosures due by 12/16/22; Final Pretrial Conference set for 07/21/23 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez with a joint pretrial statement due 7 days prior; Jury Trial set for 08/28/23 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 7 days. (Benson, A.)
February 17, 2022 Filing 10 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Paul Gordon. (Kuemerle, Karin)
February 9, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Karin Kuemerle on behalf of Paul Gordon. Attorney Kuemerle, Karin added. (Kuemerle, Karin)
January 29, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Tionna Dolin. (Dolin, Tionna)
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Vilchez, Katherine)
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Coll, A)
November 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Trina M. Clayton on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Attorney Clayton, Trina M. added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Clayton, Trina)
November 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Attorney Hugret, Spencer Peter added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
November 23, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Katherine P. Vilchez on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Vilchez, Katherine)
November 23, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Vilchez, Katherine)
November 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from San Joaquin County Superior Court, case number STK-CV-UBC-2021-0004717 by Ford Motor Company. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9941947) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of KPV, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC, #31 Exhibit DD, #32 Exhibit EE, #33 Exhibit FF -1, #34 Exhibit FF-2, #35 Exhibit GG, #36 Exhibit HH, #37 Exhibit II, #38 Exhibit JJ, #39 Exhibit KK, #40 Exhibit LL, #41 Exhibit MM, #42 Civil Cover Sheet, #43 Certificate of Service)(Vilchez, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Gordon
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Steven Whang
Represented By: Nino Sanaia
Represented By: Caitlin J. Scott
Represented By: Michael Lion Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Trina M. Clayton
Represented By: Katherine P. Vilchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?