Gilbert v. Dodd Convenience et al
Plaintiff: Darren Gilbert
Defendant: Dodd Convenience Doing business as Express Stop and Paul Carver
Case Number: 2:2021cv02185
Filed: November 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Paul Carver served on 1/7/2022, answer due 1/28/2022. (Moore, Tanya)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 01/03/22 EXTENDING the time to 01/21/22 for defendants to file their responsive pleading. (Benson, A.)
January 3, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Dodd Convenience served on 12/19/2021, answer due 1/10/2022. (Moore, Tanya)
December 31, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension for Responsive Pleading Deadline re #1 Complaint by Paul Carver, Dodd Convenience. Attorney Golden, Rachelle Taylor added. (Golden, Rachelle)
November 24, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/7/2022 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Coll, A)
November 24, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Paul Carver, Dodd Convenience* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Tanya E. Moore* *300 South First St* *Suite 342* *San Jose, CA 95113*. (Coll, A)
November 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by darren gilbert. Attorney Moore, Tanya E. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9945218) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moore, Tanya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilbert v. Dodd Convenience et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Gilbert
Represented By: Tanya E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dodd Convenience Doing business as Express Stop
Represented By: Rachelle Taylor Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Carver
Represented By: Rachelle Taylor Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?