(PC) Rouser v. Allison et al
Plaintiff: William Rouser
Defendant: Kathleen Allison, Patrick Covello, K. Rodgers and Kasos
Case Number: 2:2021cv02206
Filed: December 1, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 EXHIBIT filed by Plaintiff William Rouser re #3 Motion. (Coll, A)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The new case number is: 2:21-cv-2206-JAM-CKD. (Coll, A)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 8 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on William Rouser. (Coll, A)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Coll, A)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by William Rouser. (Rodriguez, E)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for William Rouser, CDC C-10659 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (TEXT ONLY) (Plummer, M)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *12/1/2021*; Consent or Decline due by 1/6/2022 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Kaminski, H)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL and EMAIL: #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on William Rouser. (Kaminski, H)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 EMERGENCY MOTION by William Rouser. (Kaminski, H)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by William Rouser. (Kaminski, H)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by William Rouser. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Rouser v. Allison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Rouser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Covello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kasos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?