(PS)Romero et al v. Monterey Financial Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Marie Pamela Romero and Marlito Romero
Defendant: Monterey Financial Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv02236
Filed: December 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/10/2022 ORDERING plaintiffs to SHOW CAUSE in writing within 14 days of the date of this order as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The #5 Motion to Dismiss Hearing is CONTINUED to 2/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. On or before 2/4/2022, plaintiffs shall file an opposition or statement of non-opposition to defendant's motion. Plaintiffs are cautioned that the failure to timely comply with this order may result in the recommendation that this case be dismissed. (Huang, H)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order served on Marie Pamela Romero, Marlito Romero. (Huang, H)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED #3 MOTION to DISMISS by Monterey Financial Services, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Poole, Jeff) Modified on 12/14/2021 (Coll, A).
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/10/2021: Pursuant to Local Rule 302(c)(21), Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #3 ) shall be noticed before the assigned Magistrate Judge. Counsel for Defendant shall contact the Clerk for Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes for available law and motion dates, and re-notice the motion before the Magistrate Judge with the proper time and date. Accordingly, the 1/13/2022 hearing before District Judge Troy L. Nunley is VACATED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to DISMISS by Monterey Financial Services, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/13/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Poole, Jeff)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 4 Minute Order served on Marie Pamela Romero, Marlito Romero. (Krueger, M)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Reader, L)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Superior Court County of Placer, case number R-SC-0026281 by Monterey Financial Services, LLC. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9958045) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Poole, Jeff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS)Romero et al v. Monterey Financial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Pamela Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlito Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monterey Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: Jeff Wiley Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?