(PC) McFadden v. Newsom et al
Plaintiff: Karsene McFadden
Defendant: Gavin Newsom, Michael A Savage, Ann Marie Schubert and Scott Jones
Case Number: 2:2021cv02411
Filed: December 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/14/2022 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a completed affidavit in support of his request to proceed IFP and a certified copy of his inmate trust account statement for the 6 month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. Clerk to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner. (Henshaw, R)
February 14, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order and IFP application served on Karsene McFadden. (Henshaw, R)
January 31, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Karsene McFadden. (Coll, A)
January 31, 2022 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Karsene McFadden. (Coll, A)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/10/2022 ORDERING plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days, either the fee in the amount of $402.00 or a properly completed ifp application. The Clerk shall send plaintiff an ifp application. (Yin, K)
January 11, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order and ifp application served on Karsene McFadden. (Yin, K)
December 28, 2021 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 1/31/2022 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Kaminski, H)
December 28, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, served on Karsene McFadden. (Kaminski, H)
December 27, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Karsene McFadden.(Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) McFadden v. Newsom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karsene McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Marie Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?